In re: UTSTARCOM, INC. SECURITIES LITIGATION

Case Number: 5:2004cv04908
Filed: November 17, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2011 471 Opinion or Order of the Court Revised Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice re 470 Notice (Other). Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/17/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
November 17, 2010 452 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting Second Revised Order Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Providing for Notice re 450 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/17/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010) Modified text on 11/17/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2010 440 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT REGARDING SETTLEMENT AND CASE SCHEDULED STAY re 439 Stipulation. Joint Status Statement due by 10/8/2010. Status Conference set for 10/18/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/14/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
August 31, 2010 430 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS MODIFIED. Signed by Judge James Ware on August 31, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 9, 2010 423 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Modifying the 343 Scheduling Order February 17, 2010 re: EXPERT DISCOVERY re 421 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/9/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
July 26, 2010 419 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO MODIFY FEBRUARY 17, 2010 SCHEDULING ORDER re 416 Stipulation, filed by Erwin DeBruycker, Locals 302 and 612 International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Retirement Trust. Signed by Judge James Ware on July 26, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
May 13, 2010 399 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Settlement and Providing For Notice re 398 Proposed Order. Fairness hearing set for 8/30/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/13/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
March 12, 2010 356 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extension of Class Certification Briefing re 354 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
January 20, 2010 341 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs re 337 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Paul Seefer terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
December 18, 2009 340 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Staying Class Certification Briefing; Setting Further Case Management Conference re 339 Stipulation. Status Report due by 2/12/2010. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/18/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
November 17, 2009 336 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION FROM 1/25/2010 TO 2/22/2010 re 332 Stipulation, 325 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification. Objections due by 12/18/2009. Replies due by 1/22/2010. Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/17/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
July 2, 2009 323 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED to Continue Motion Hearing re 321 Stipulation. Motion Hearing re Class Certification set for 1/25/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/1/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
June 12, 2009 322 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING re 320 Stipulation. The parties may not modify the schedule without first seeking leave of Court. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/11/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
May 22, 2009 319 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extension of Time to File a Motion to Strike defendants re 318 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/21/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 12, 2009 317 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 316 . Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 5/12/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 11, 2009 315 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 309 Parties Proposed Form of Protective Order. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 5/8/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
April 13, 2009 306 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE from 4/27/09 to 5/4/09; Joint Case Management Statement due from 4/17/09 to 4/24/09 re 304 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Statement due 4/24/2009. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/13/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
November 20, 2008 279 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTIONS from 12/15/2008 to 1/16/2009 re 252 MOTION to Intervene, 253 MOTION to Strike Allegations from the Fourth Amended Complaint, 258 MOTION to Strike Options Allegations From Fourth Amended Consolidate d Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws, 271 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Consolidated Complaint, 257 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Consolidated Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/20/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
September 5, 2008 256 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Ware DENYING 245 Motion to Relate Case C07-4578 SI. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008) Modified on 9/8/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: UTSTARCOM, INC. SECURITIES LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?