Williams v. Vidmar et al Featured Case

Case Number: 5:2004cv04946
Filed: November 22, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2005 41 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT and Dismissal With Prejudice of Plaintiff Stephen Williams and Defendant Patricia Vidmar by Patricia Vidmar, Patricia Vidmar. (Davis, Mark) (Filed on 8/11/2005)
May 27, 2005 34 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to Amended Complaint byBen Liao, Josephine Lucey, Gary McCue, George Tyson, Patricia Vidmar, William Bragg, Pearl Cheng. (Davis, Mark) (Filed on 5/27/2005)
May 13, 2005 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against all defendants. Filed byStephen J. Williams. (Theriot, Kevin) (Filed on 5/13/2005)
January 3, 2005 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against all defendants. Filed byStephen J. Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Theriot, Kevin) (Filed on 1/3/2005)
November 22, 2004 1 COMPLAINT (Summons Issued) against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 4410482.). Filed byStephen J. Williams. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/15/2004 (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Vidmar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?