Los Altos El Granada Investors v. City of Capitola et al

Case Number: 5:2004cv05138
Filed: December 3, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2011 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/15/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
July 28, 2011 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 170 STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/28/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
May 25, 2011 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND CUT-OFF DATES AND TEMPORARY STAY (approving 168 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/25/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
April 4, 2011 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 159 DR. KENNETH BAAR'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE RE DENIAL OF ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/4/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
March 21, 2011 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART 124 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS RELATING TO DEFENDANTS' INITIAL DISCLOSURE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/21/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 11, 2011 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO QUASH AND FOR SANCTIONS AND GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 126 Motion to Quash; denying 132 Motion for Sanctions (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
February 18, 2011 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 18, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 16, 2011 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Modifying Briefing Schedule re 134 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 16, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
September 29, 2010 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 106 DEFENDANTS' SECOND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/29/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Los Altos El Granada Investors v. City of Capitola et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?