Dan Whitney et al v. Charles Wurtz et al

Case Number: 5:2004cv05232
Filed: December 10, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2009 387 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE TO JULY 28, 2009 re 386 Stipulation filed by Will Arntz. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on June 15, 2009. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
February 25, 2009 375 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE re 374 Proposed Order filed by Dan Whitney, 373 Status Report filed by Dan Whitney. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on February 25, 2009. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 6, 2008 361 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Status Conference as modified by the Court. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 2/6/08. (pvtlc3) (Filed on 2/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dan Whitney et al v. Charles Wurtz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?