December 15, 2010 |
Filing
781
STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal with Prejudice re 780 Stipulation filed by Avago Technologies ECBU IP PTE Ltd, Elan Microelectronics Corporation, Avago Technologies General IP PTE Ltd. ***CMC Deadlines terminated. Motions terminated: [75 6] MOTION for Summary Judgment / Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,433,780, 755 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY OF CLAIM 4 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,433,780, 753 MOTION for Summary Judgment / Elan Microelectronics Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Elan Cannot be Found Liable for Willful Infringement. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/15/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
|
August 19, 2010 |
Filing
752
SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 750 Case Management Statement. Based on their joint submission, it appears that a schedule for the case can be set without the necessity of an appearance at this time. A ccordingly, the Case Management Conference is VACATED and the parties are ordered to comply with the following schedule: Opening Supplemental Expert Reports Due 9/17/2010, Rebuttal Supplemental Expert Reports Due 10/15/2010, Last Date for Hearing Dis positive Motions 12/20/2010. None of the dates set in this Order may be changed without an order of the Court made aftera motion is filed pursuant to the Civil Local Rules of Court. ***CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/18/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
|
December 7, 2009 |
Filing
729
ORDER FOLLOWING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. On or before 12/18/2009, the parties shall file a Stipulation with respect to amediation process, which shall include a selection of a mediator and a time frame forcompletion of such mediation. Furt her ClaimConstruction hearing set for 3/19/2010 9:00 AM. Deadline to complete claim briefing on or before 3/5/2010. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2010. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 3/9/2010. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/7/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
|
October 22, 2009 |
Filing
723
STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT CONTINUING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE AND MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL re 722 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 722 Stipulation, 721 MOTION for Certification for Interlo cutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(B). Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/22/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
|
October 8, 2009 |
Filing
720
STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference from 10/19/2009 to 11/2/2009 re 719 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 10/23/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/8/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
|
May 12, 2009 |
Filing
691
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OR FOR A NEW TRIAL. The parties shall file any cross-briefs on or before 5/22/2009; the parties may file any reply-brief on or before 5/28/2009. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/9/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/12/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
|
April 7, 2009 |
Filing
627
ORDER CONTINUING DATE FOR JURY SELECTION; ADDRESSING THE PARTIES REQUEST FORMODIFICATION OF PRETRIAL ORDER RE: TRIAL EXHIBITS re 626 Letter. The Court finds good cause to adopt the parties modification. Thus, the parties shall adhere to their proposed modification during trial. Jury Selection set for 4/15/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. All other trial dates remain unchanged. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/7/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
|
February 20, 2009 |
Filing
533
STIPULATION AND ORDER DENYING Request to Continue Pretrial Conference and Trial re 531 Stipulation. Nothing in this Order prevents the parties from ompleting the pretrial processes and simultaneously discuss settlement. Inthe event that the parties' settlement discussions are fruitful and definite, the parties may renew their request. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/19/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
|
September 8, 2008 |
Filing
514
ORDER FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: The parties shall submit a joint or separate letter updates no later than 9/12/2008. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/8/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
|