Rambus Inc., v. Hynix Semiconductor Inc. et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv00334
Filed: January 25, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2014 3248 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 3247 of Dismissal as to Nanya. Nanya Technology Corporation Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/15/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
July 24, 2013 3246 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 3245 of Dismissal, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/24/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
February 11, 2010 3208 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 3207 of Dismissal as to Samsung. Samsung Austin Semiconductor, L.P., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, L.P., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, L.P., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, L.P., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, L.P., Samsung Aust in Semiconductor, L.P., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, L.P., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, L.P., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, L.P., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, L.P., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, L.P., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, L.P., Samsung Au stin Semiconductor, L.P., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, L.P., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, L.P., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Elec tronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electroni cs America, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Sam sung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsu ng Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Semic onductor, Inc., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Austin Semiconductor, L.P. and Samsung Austin Semiconductor, L.P. terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/9/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
May 14, 2009 3188 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW WITH RESPECT TO SAMSUNG'S COUNTS I-III and ESTOPPEL DEFENSE (Revised Redacted). Signed by Judge Whyte on 5/14/09. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
April 27, 2009 3187 Opinion or Order of the Court REDACTED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW WITH RESPECT TO SAMSUNG'S COUNTS I-III AND ESTOPPEL DEFENSE. Signed by Judge Whyte on 04/27/09. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
April 13, 2009 3186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte responding to Rambus' Request for Case Management Conference, Docket No. (3180) in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW and Docket No. (1838) in case 5:05-cv-02298-RMW. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
February 3, 2009 3172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/3/2009. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
January 21, 2009 3139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 3033 of Withdrawal of Jones Day as Counsel of Record for Non-Party Texas Instruments Inc., Attorney Kelli A. Crouch terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/21/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
December 29, 2008 2998 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte regarding Rambus's MIL Nos. 21 & 23 & Mfrs's MIL Nos. 23 & 35, i.e, granting (1679) Motion in Limine; granting (1685) Motion in Limine; granting (1719) Motion in Limine; granting (1752) Motion in Limine in cas e 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; granting (2697) Motion in Limine; granting (2701) Motion in Limine; granting (2728) Motion in Limine; granting (2734) Motion in Limine in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW; granting (1444) Motion in Limine; granting (1456) Motion in Limine; granting (1487) Motion in Limine; granting (1529) Motion in Limine in case 5:05-cv-02298-RMW. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2008)
December 24, 2008 2995 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 2955 on Pretrial Schedule. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/24/8. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2008)
December 23, 2008 2993 Opinion or Order of the Court Sealing ORDER 2739 . Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/23/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 15, 2008 2873 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying the Manufacturers' MSJ No. 1, striking the Manufacturers' MSJ No. 2, and granting in part and denying in part Rambus's motion to strike those motions, i.e., denying (1490) Motion for Summary Judgm ent; striking (1525) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (1562) Motion to Strike in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; denying (2406) Motion for Summary Judgment; striking (2458) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and de nying in part (2533) Motion to Strike in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW; denying (1251) Motion for Summary Judgment; striking (1286) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (1327) Motion to Strike in case 5:05-cv-02298-RMW. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 12, 2008 2803 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR PROPOSED AGENDAS. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/12/2008. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 4, 2008 2798 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding pretrial submissions with respect to willfulness. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/4/2008. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
November 26, 2008 2665 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST for proposed agendas. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/26/2008. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 24, 2008 2608 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting in part and denying in part (200) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (201) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 5:06-cv-00244-RMW; granting in part and denying in part (503) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (505) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (506) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (507) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (509) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (510) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW; granting in part and denying in part (355) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 5:05-cv-02298-RMW. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 21, 2008 2603 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER clarifying the court's construction of "memory device." Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/21/2008. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 19, 2008 2601 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Withdrawal of David J. Healey and Anita E. Kadala as Counsel for Samsung re 1322 in 5:05-cv-02298-RMW; 2518 in 5:05-cv-00334-RMW. Attorney Anita E. Kadala; David J. Healey and Ana Elena Kadala terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/19/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
November 13, 2008 2534 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding page limits on specified Daubert briefing. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/13/2008. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
October 31, 2008 2512 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re separate briefing on Rambus's Daubert motion no. 3. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/31/2008. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 21, 2008 2389 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating hearing date. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/21/2008. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 20, 2008 2388 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Permission to Bring Equipment to the 10/21/2008 Hearing and to Use Loading Dock 2385 in 5:05-cv-00334-RMW; ( 1240 in 5:05-cv-02298-RMW. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/20/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
October 15, 2008 2379 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Change Time for Expert Discovery, Daubert Motions, and Dispositive Motions re: 2330 in 5:05-cv-00334-RMW; 1470 in 5:06-cv-00244-RMW); 1218 in 5:05-cv-02298-RMW. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/15/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 14, 2008 2364 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend the Deadlines for Teece and Prowse Depositions and Any Related Daubert Briefing 2353 in 5:05-cv-00334-RMW; 1222 in 5:05-cv-02298-RMW; 1475 in 5:06-cv-00244-RMW. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/10/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 6, 2008 2345 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER shortening time on the briefing schedule for Rambus's emergency motion to strike. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/4/2008. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
September 29, 2008 2307 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting (2035) Motion to Strike ; granting (2049) Motion to Strike in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW; granting (1011) Motion to Strike in case 5:05-cv-02298-RMW. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 24, 2008 2287 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend the Deadlines for McAlexander Deposition and Any Related Daubert Briefing re 1455 in 5:06-cv-00244-RMW, 1152 in 5:05-cv-02298-RMW), 2234 in 5:05-cv-00334-RMW. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/24/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
September 19, 2008 2228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Joint Request for Permission to Bring Equipment to Trial and to Use Loading Dock re 1112 in 5:05-cv-02298-RMW, 2182 in 5:05-cv-00334-RMW. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/19/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 16, 2008 2210 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing with prejudice claims and defenses to the extent based on certain issues. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/16/2008. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
September 8, 2008 2147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requesting Rambus to file a reply brief to its motion in limine 1044 (C-05-02298). Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/8/2008. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 5, 2008 2139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying (2119) Motion to Dismiss; granting (2121) Motion to Shorten Time in case 5:05-cv-00334-RMW; denying (1068) Motion to Dismiss; granting (1070) Motion to Shorten Time in case 5:05-cv-02298-RMW. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
February 3, 2008 1170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING 943 Objection, filed by Nanya Technology Corporation U.S.A., Nanya Technology Corporation. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/3/2008. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rambus Inc., v. Hynix Semiconductor Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?