NVIDIA Corporation v. Carlyle Fortran Trust et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv00427
Filed: January 28, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:1334 Bankruptcy cases and proceedings under title 11
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2010 321 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) re 320 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/3/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
July 15, 2010 319 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT VACATING 7/19/2010 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; REFERRING CASE to Private ADR re (34 in 5:09-cv-02478-JW) Stipulation, (318 in 5:05-cv-00427-JW) Stipulation. Mediation deadline set for 8/30/2010. ***CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/15/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
January 27, 2010 316 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT FOR BRIEFING AND HEARING ON CARLYE'S APPEAL re (12 in 5:09-cv-02478-JW) Stipulation, (315 in 5:05-cv-00427-JW) Stipulation. The Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2010 in 5:05-cv-00427-JW is VACATED. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/27/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010) Modified text on 1/28/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2009 292 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Amended Complaint (in 5:05-cv-00428-JW) due by 8/10/2009. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2009 09:00 AM; Further Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/8/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009) Modified on 7/21/2009 (sp, COURT STAFF).
June 16, 2009 286 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 284 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 6/27/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2009)
May 7, 2009 281 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Vacating Deadline for Case Management Conference statement and Further Case Management Conference re 278 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/7/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
March 25, 2009 275 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; VACATING HEARING re (266 in 5:05-cv-00427-JW) MOTION for Hearing re Order Establishing Trustee's Abandonment of Carlyle Claims. Amended Complaint and Joint Case Management Conference statement d ue by 5/8/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/25/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NVIDIA Corporation v. Carlyle Fortran Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?