eBay Inc., v. Nikon Inc., Featured Case

Plaintiff eBay, Inc. alleged that defendant Nikon Inc. agreed to become a Premier Sponsor of the 2003 eBay Live! convention for a reduced price of $100,000. However, defendant has refused to pay the Premier Sponsorship fee.

Plaintiff: eBay Inc.,
Defendant: Nikon Inc.,
Counter-claimant: Nikon Inc.,
Counter-defendant: eBay Inc.,
Case Number: 5:2005cv00491
Filed: February 2, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2005 9 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Richrad Seeborg on 5/2/05. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2005)
April 29, 2005 8
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Nikon Inc.,. (Avrith, Charles) (Filed on 4/29/2005)
February 9, 2005 5
ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against eBay Inc., byNikon Inc.,. (Avrith, Charles) (Filed on 2/9/2005)
February 3, 2005 6
ERRATA re 1 Notice of Removal by Nikon Inc.,, Nikon Inc.,. (lrb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/16/2005 (lrb, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2005 7
NOTICE by Nikon Inc., (lrb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/16/2005 (lrb, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 2/16/2005 (lrb, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: eBay Inc., v. Nikon Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: eBay Inc.,
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikon Inc.,
Represented By: Charles Avrith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Nikon Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: eBay Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?