Google, Inc. v. Affinity Engines, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Google Inc. alleges that defendant Affinity Engines Inc. infringed on plaintiff\'s copyrights by using software code owned by Google that implements social networking functionalities and was written by Orkut Buyukkokten, a Google employee.

Plaintiff: Google, Inc.
Defendant: Affinity Engines, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2005cv00598
Filed: February 9, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2006 75 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 01/20/06. (mp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2006)
January 19, 2006 74
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Dismissal by Google, Inc.. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 1/19/2006)
January 12, 2006 73
RESPONSE in Support JOINT STATEMENT OF PARTIES IN RESPONSE TO THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT filed byAffinity Engines, Inc.. (Guy, George) (Filed on 1/12/2006)
December 2, 2005 72 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge James Ware to show cause re: settlement. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2005)
November 22, 2005 68 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge JAMES WARE granting 64 Motion OF AFFINITY ENGINES INC TO SEAL DOCUMENTS (rd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2005)
November 21, 2005 66
Proposed Order by Affinity Engines, Inc.. (Bens, Rory) (Filed on 11/21/2005)
November 9, 2005 59 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/09/05. (mp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2005)
November 8, 2005 58
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by Google, Inc.. (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 11/8/2005)
November 1, 2005 55 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER SEALING DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/1/05. (mp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2005)
October 31, 2005 54
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Affinity Engines, Inc. re 51 MOTION Affinity Engines, Inc. Miscellaneous Administrative Request to File Under Seal (Ramsey, Gabriel) (Filed on 10/31/2005)
October 18, 2005 47
Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/17/2005 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 10/18/2005). (Court Reporter not reported.) (mp, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/18/2005)
October 17, 2005 46 Opinion or Order of the Court
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge James Ware following case management conference. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2005)
September 29, 2005 45 Opinion or Order of the Court
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge James Ware following case management conference. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2005)
September 27, 2005 44
Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/26/2005 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 9/27/2005), Interim Case Management Conference is set for 10/17/05 at 10:00am, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Hearing set for 2/27/2006 09:00 AM. (C/R UNREPORTED) (mp, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/27/2005) Modified text on 9/27/2005, to conform with document posted by the Court.(cv, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2005 42
Defendant's ANSWER to Amended Complaint byAffinity Engines, Inc.. (Ramsey, Gabriel) (Filed on 8/26/2005)
August 12, 2005 41
CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2005 10:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2005. (rd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2005)
June 10, 2005 39
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT /Rule 26(f) Report filed by Google, Inc.. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 6/10/2005)
June 2, 2005 38
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Bens, Rory) (Filed on 6/2/2005)
June 1, 2005 37
ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 6/13/05 at 9:30 a.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2005)
May 31, 2005 36
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Affinity Engines, Inc. Affinity Engines, Inc.'s Statement Regarding ADR Procedure (Guy, George) (Filed on 5/31/2005)
May 5, 2005 33
OBJECTIONS to AFFINITY ENGINES, INC.'S OBJECTIONS TO GOOGLE INC.'S LETTER REQUEST FOR CONSIDERATION OF SURREPLY by Affinity Engines, Inc.. (O'Rourke, Peter) (Filed on 5/5/2005)
April 25, 2005 29 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge 4/25/05 granting 24 Motion to seal documents by Defendant Affinity Engines Inc., (rd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2005)
April 18, 2005 21
Proposed Order Granting Google's Misc. Administrative Request to File Documents Under Seal by Google, Inc.. (Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 4/18/2005)
March 15, 2005 15
Memorandum in Opposition to Notice of Pendency of Other Action filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 3/15/2005)
March 1, 2005 14
NOTICE of Related Case re Notice of Pendency of Other Action Case Number 104 CV 020368 is currently pending before Judge William J. Elfving in Santa Clara Superior Court. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-13 (Bens, Rory) (Filed on 3/1/2005) Modified on 3/2/2005 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2005 11
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google, Inc. re 10 Clerks Notice Case Management Conference Notice (Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 2/25/2005)
February 14, 2005 9
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google, Inc. re 8 Amended Complaint for Copyright Infringement and Declaratory Relief (Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 2/14/2005)
February 11, 2005 7 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Ware for all further proceedings. Judge Bernard Zimmerman no longer assigned to case. Signed by EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE on 2/11/05. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2005)
February 10, 2005 5
Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Google, Inc. Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 2/10/2005)
February 9, 2005 3
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2005)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Google, Inc. v. Affinity Engines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affinity Engines, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Lance Wesenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Berta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?