Tele Atlas N.V. et al v. NAVTEQ Corporation

Case Number: 5:2005cv01673
Filed: April 22, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2008 446 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/17/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
November 19, 2008 398 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 396 Stipulation, filed by Tele Atlas North America, Tele Atlas N.V. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/19/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
November 13, 2008 390 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ESTABLISHING TRIAL PROTOCOL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/13/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
November 5, 2008 363 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 337 Motion to Compel (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
October 28, 2008 341 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting in part and denying in part 328 Motion; granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 77 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 92 Motion; etc. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 21, 2008 326 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PRETRIAL PREPARATION re 325 . Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/21/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 14, 2008 325 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2008 01:30 PM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/14/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
September 8, 2008 282 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 280 to Continue Pretrial Conference Date. Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/8/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
February 6, 2008 224 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 223 to Continue Motion Hearing Date: Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Motions to Strike; Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Submit Additional Expert Disclosure and Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of William Kerr. Motion Hearing reset for 4/18/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/6/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tele Atlas N.V. et al v. NAVTEQ Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?