Computer Cache Coherency Corporation v. Intel Corporation

Case Number: 5:2005cv01766
Filed: April 28, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2009 235 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 231 Motion for Taxation of Costs. Costs taxed in the amount of $89,808.84 against Computer Cache Coherency Corporation. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
August 31, 2009 219 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Whyte on 08/31/09. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009) Modified on 8/31/2009 (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2009 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 213 Re: Stipulated Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendnats' Counterclaims for Declaratory Judgment of Invalidity and Unenforceability and for Order Directing Clerk to Enter Judgment. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/24/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
October 21, 2008 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 192 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order on Cross-Motions Re: Infringement. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Computer Cache Coherency Corporation v. Intel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?