Brown v. Google, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Robert A. Brown sued Google, Inc., Payrolling.com and Marissa Mayer in state court. Plaintiff alleged that he understood from his interview that he would receive full benefits and increased pay once his probationary period ended. Google filed a notice of removal to federal court and contended that ERISA preempted some of plaintiff\'s causes of action.

Plaintiff: Robert A. Brown
Defendant: Google, Inc., Payrolling.com and Marissa Mayer
Case Number: 5:2005cv01779
Filed: April 29, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2005 39 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 36 Motion to Remand, finding as moot 7 Motion to Dismiss (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2005)
July 29, 2005 38
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/29/2005 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 7/29/2005) re 7 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS GOOGLE INC.'S AND MARISSA MAYER'S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Google, Inc.,, Marissa Mayer,, 16 MOTION to Remand filed by Robert A. Brown,, 36 MOTION to Remand Second Notice of Continued Hearing filed by Robert A. Brown,. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, Court Staff) (Date Filed: 7/29/2005)
July 12, 2005 37
NOTICE by Marissa Mayer, Google, Inc. re 7 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS GOOGLE INC.'S AND MARISSA MAYER'S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF of Continued Hearing (Burror, Heather) (Filed on 7/12/2005)
July 11, 2005 36
MOTION to Remand Second Notice of Continued Hearing filed by Robert A. Brown. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2005 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Sheffer, Gregory) (Filed on 7/11/2005)
June 30, 2005 35
Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed byRobert A. Brown. (Sheffer, Gregory) (Filed on 6/30/2005)
June 24, 2005 34
CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2005)
June 21, 2005 30
AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint byPayrolling.com. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/11/2005 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2005 29
CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File plaintiff's Notice of Continued Hearing (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2005)
June 16, 2005 28
NOTICE of Continued Hearing on Motion 16 MOTION to Remand: Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2005 09:00 AM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2005 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2005 27
NOTICE by Marissa Mayer, Google, Inc. re 7 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS GOOGLE INC.'S AND MARISSA MAYER'S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF, 23 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) of Continued Hearing (Burror, Heather) (Filed on 6/14/2005)
June 7, 2005 26 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Patricia V Trumbull remains as the referral judge. Signed by Executive Committee on June 7, 2005. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2005)
June 6, 2005 24
Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Marissa Mayer, Google, Inc. and Request for Reassignment to a U.S. District Judge. (Burror, Heather) (Filed on 6/6/2005)
June 2, 2005 22 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Continuing Hearing on Motion to Dismiss; and Setting Deadline for Parties to Each File Either a Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, or else a Declination and Request for Reassignment. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 6/2/05. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 6/2/2005)
May 31, 2005 21
Certificate of Interested Entities or parties (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2005 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2005 18
MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Robert A. Brown's Motion to Remand filed by Robert A. Brown. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/27/2005 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2005 15
CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File Notice of Removal by counsel for Defendant and or failure to Register as an E-Filer (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2005)
May 16, 2005 14
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marissa Mayer, Google, Inc. (AMENDED) of Supplementary Material Under L.R. 4-2 (Burror, Heather) (Filed on 5/16/2005)
May 6, 2005 9
Proposed Order re 7 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS GOOGLE INC.'S AND MARISSA MAYER'S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF, 8 Declaration in Support,, by Marissa Mayer, Google, Inc.. (Burror, Heather) (Filed on 5/6/2005)
May 3, 2005 5
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google, Inc. of Notice to Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Court (Burror, Heather) (Filed on 5/3/2005)
April 29, 2005 4
Joinder re [1] Notice of Removal by Marissa Mayer, Marissa Mayer. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2005 (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Google, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Brown
Represented By: Gregory Mark Sheffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine A. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payrolling.com
Represented By: Aniko M. Felsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marissa Mayer
Represented By: Catherine A. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?