Federal Insurance Company v. St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company

Case Number: 5:2005cv01878
Filed: May 6, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2011 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING FURTHER DOCUMENTATION; SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART DEFENDANT'S 186 OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S BILL OF COSTS. On or before February 4, 2011, Plaintiff shall submit to the Clerk of Court an amended Bill of Cost form with detailed itemization and supporting documentation in accordance with the terms of this Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 19, 2011. (jwlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011) Modified text on 1/19/2011 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2008 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE PROPOSED JUDGMENT re 156 Joint Case Management Statement. The Court CONTINUES the Case Management set for 12/15/2008. Proposed Judgment or Joint Case Management Conference statement due 12/17/2008. Case Management Conference set for 12/22/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/10/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
October 22, 2008 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference from 10/27/2008 to 12/15/2008 re 152 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Federal Insurance Company. Joint Case Management Statement or Proposed Judgments due 12/5/2008. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/22/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Insurance Company v. St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?