United States of America et al v. The County of Santa Clara et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv01962
Filed: May 12, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2012 409 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Motion Hearing re 406 relator's Motion for Review of Taxation of Costs." Matter deemed submitted without oral argument. 2/7/2012 hearing vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/3/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
January 9, 2012 407 Opinion or Order of the Court INTERIM ORDER re 392 relator's motion for attorneys' fees. Unredacted billing statements to be submitted for in camera review by 1/23/2012. Unless otherwise ordered, matter will be deemed submitted on the papers. 1/10/2012 hearing vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/9/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
October 31, 2011 390 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (1) Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Denying Relator's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; (3) Granting Defendants' Motions to Strike; and (4) Denying Relator's Alternative Motions for Relief. Re: 197 , 324 , 347 , 350 , 365 , 371 , 373 , 374 , 388 . Clerk to enter judgment and close the file. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
June 24, 2010 332 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 331 modifying scheduling order re cross-motions for summary judgment. Oppositions due by 6/25/2010. Replies due by 8/5/2010. Motion hearings set for 9/14/2010, 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/24/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
April 28, 2010 328 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 327 Modifying Scheduling Order. Schedule re cross-motions for summary judgment modified as follows: Oppositions due by 6/22/2010. Replies due by 7/20/2010. Motion hearing set for 8/24/2010, 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/28/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
March 8, 2010 305 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 293 relator's motion to continue dispositive motion deadlines. Motions due 4/6/2010. Oppositions due 4/20/2010. Replies due 4/27/2010. Dispositive motion hearings set for 5/11/2010, 10:00 AM. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
December 4, 2009 284 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 278 McLean's Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Substitute New Counsel. Case stayed through 1/4/2010. Joint status report due by 1/5/2010. Case management conference set for 1/12/2010, 1:30 PM. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
October 9, 2009 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 269 , 270 Permitting Conditional Withdrawal by Relator's Counsel and Staying Case. Case stayed through 11/30/2009. Parties' status report due 12/1/2009. Case management conference set for 12/8/2009, 1:30 PM. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
September 8, 2009 271 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 264 Relator's Motion for Discovery. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
July 10, 2009 268 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Following In Camera Review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/10/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
January 23, 2009 263 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re Case Management and terminating 196 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment without prejudice to re-notice the motion pending court's decision as to whether further discovery will be permitted. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 22, 2009 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 180 relator's motion for sanctions re interrogatories and document requests. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
December 8, 2008 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 184 relator's Motion for Sanctions; denying as moot 186 defendant County of Santa Clara's Motion to Terminate Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(6) Deposition. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 250 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Deadline for Defendants to Complete Expert Discovery. Relator's motion for protective order 246 is terminated.(hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
September 8, 2008 244 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 237 Relator's Motion for Certification of Final Judgment. Motion hearing set for 9/8/2008 is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. The County of Santa Clara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?