Carrizosa et al v. Stassinos et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv02280
Filed: June 6, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2011 324 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 315 Motion for Attorney Fees (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
November 5, 2010 314 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 312 Motion for Extension of Time to File (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
October 29, 2010 311 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 305 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Whyte on 10/29/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
June 29, 2010 303 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 296 Further Proceedings. Signed by Judge Whyte on 6/29/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 11, 2010 297 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER deferring class notice and staying action against Stassinos. Signed by Judge Whyte on 6/11/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 1, 2010 293 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 289 Status Report filed by Mary Pea, Richard L Carrizosa. Signed by Judge Whyte on 6/1/10. (rmwlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
April 7, 2010 283 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Motion to Appear Telephonically at CMC by Defendant Paul Stassinos. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/7/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
January 10, 2010 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 262 Motion for Reconsideration. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2010)
March 30, 2009 270 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 243 Motion to Certify Class; denying 245 Motion to Stay. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 9, 2009 263 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 262 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Court's Order Re: Cross Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Whyte on 03/09/09. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 6, 2009 259 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 255 to Continue Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Class Certification and Defendant's Motion to Abate: Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/6/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrizosa et al v. Stassinos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?