Sherwood v. Wavecrest Corporation et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv02354
Filed: June 9, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2010 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 200 DEFENDANT LEISZ'S MOTION TO COMPEL PERFORMANCE OF SETTLEMENT; AND DENYING 200 DEFENDANT LEISZ'S MOTION FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/8/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
April 20, 2009 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 180 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/20/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
September 19, 2008 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 167 MOTION to for Assignment of Rights and Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/18/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherwood v. Wavecrest Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?