Mizera v. Google Featured Case

Plaintiff alleges that defendant Google Inc. has failed to take any significant measures to track or prevent click fraud, to adequately warn its customers about the existence of click fraud, to adequately advise customers that they have been victimized by click fraud, and to refund customers the excess charges that they have incurred as a result of the click fraud.

Plaintiff: Steve Mizera
Defendant: Google Inc.,
Case Number: 5:2005cv02885
Filed: July 15, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2007 36 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/25/07. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2007)
December 7, 2006 35 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing Action, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/7/06. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2006)
April 5, 2006 34 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Whyte Regarding Stay Request (see 20) (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2006)
March 30, 2006 33 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Whyte Regarding Stay Request (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2006)
March 29, 2006 32
Proposed Order by Google Inc.,. (Silbert, David) (Filed on 3/29/2006)
March 16, 2006 29
OBJECTIONS to re 28 Response in Support of Motion to Stay by Steve Mizera. (Kellner, Richard) (Filed on 3/16/2006)
March 13, 2006 27
Proposed Order re 25 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Stay by Steve Mizera. (Kellner, Richard) (Filed on 3/13/2006)
March 9, 2006 22
Proposed Order re 20 MOTION to Stay : Defendant Google Inc's Motion to Stay Pending Settlement, 21 Declaration in Support, by Google Inc.,. (Silbert, David) (Filed on 3/9/2006)
January 26, 2006 19 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Consolidate Actions. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/13/06. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2006)
November 22, 2005 18
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against all defendants. Filed bySteve Mizera. (Kaplan, Darren) (Filed on 11/22/2005)
November 18, 2005 17
Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/18/2005 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 11/18/2005). Further Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2006 10:30 AM. Hearing on Class Certification set for 5/12/2006 @ 9:00 am.(Court Reporter Not Reported.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/18/2005)
November 15, 2005 16
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Order filed by Google Inc.,. (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 11/15/2005)
October 5, 2005 15
Statement of Non-Opposition re 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed bySteve Mizera. (Related document(s)9) (Kaplan, Darren) (Filed on 10/5/2005)
September 27, 2005 14 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg remains as the referral judge. Signed by Executive Committee on September 27, 2005. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2005)
September 26, 2005 11
CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Google Inc.,.. (Roberts, Clement) (Filed on 9/26/2005)
September 13, 2005 8
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steve Mizera (Kellner, Richard) (Filed on 9/13/2005)
August 31, 2005 7
CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (lrb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2005)
August 16, 2005 5 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lrb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2005 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2005 3
CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File the complaint filed on 7/15/05 and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2005)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mizera v. Google
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.,
Represented By: Clement S. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Mizera
Represented By: Darren T. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?