Juan Medina v. Argent Mortgage Company et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv02905
Filed: July 15, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 12:3410 Right to Financial Privacy Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2010 260 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 252 plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Remaining Claims and Defendants With Prejudice. Parties to bear their own fees and costs. The clerk shall close the file. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
June 14, 2010 251 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 250 Request to Continue Case Management Conference. Case management conference continued to 8/17/2010, 1:30 PM. Further status report due by 8/10/2010. Plaintiffs' dismissal to be filed promptly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/14/2010.(hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
April 8, 2010 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 247 granting plaintiffs' request to continue case management conference. Case management conference continued to 6/15/2010, 1:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/8/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
February 10, 2010 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting request to continue case management conference. Case management conference set for 4/13/2010, 1:30 PM. Further status report due by 4/6/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/10/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
December 9, 2009 243 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 242 request to continue case management conference. Case management conference continued to 2/16/2010, 1:30 PM. Further status report due by 2/9/2010. Plaintiffs to serve this order on defendant Ponte if they establish contact with him. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/09/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
September 1, 2009 235 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Parties to File a Status Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/1/2009. Joint status report due by 9/15/2009.(hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
September 11, 2008 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 225 Argent Mortgage Company's Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint Against Commonwealth Land Title Company. Commonwealth Land Title Company is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/11/2008. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)
February 6, 2008 180 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Rescheduling Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Defendant BNC's opposition due 2/19/2008. Plaintiffs' reply due 2/26/2008. Motion hearing set for 3/11/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/6/2008. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juan Medina v. Argent Mortgage Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?