IN RE MERCURY INTERACTIVE SECURITIES LITIGATION

Case Number: 5:2005cv03395
Filed: August 19, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2011 417 Opinion or Order of the Court DISTRIBUTION ORDER FOR THE NET SETTLEMENT FUND (granting 406 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/22/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
March 3, 2011 416 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 396 RENEWED APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/3/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
November 23, 2010 395 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING REVISED HEARING NOTICE (granting 393 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/22/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
October 19, 2010 392 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING DATES TO PROVIDE ADDITIONAL NOTICE TO THE CLASS AND SET A HEARING REGARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES (granting 387 , approving 391 ). Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2011 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/15/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
November 14, 2008 384 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 383 Allowing Expense Reimbursement from Settlement Fund. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/13/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
September 26, 2008 373 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND REIMBURSING EXPENSES (granting docket no. 362 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/25/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 25, 2008 372 Opinion or Order of the Court **ENTERED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD** ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND REIMBURSING EXPENSES (granting docket no. 362 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/25/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008) Modified on 9/26/2008 (jflc2, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE MERCURY INTERACTIVE SECURITIES LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?