Goldberg v. Cameron et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv03534
Filed: August 31, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2011 234 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 216 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 218 Motion for Attorney Fees (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
June 22, 2011 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 228 Ex Parte Application (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
April 4, 2011 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 175 Motion for Summary Judgment (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
October 21, 2010 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 166 Ex Parte Application to Stay Discovery. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
September 27, 2010 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 161 Motion for Extension of Time. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
March 19, 2010 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 142 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jefferson Thomas Stamp terminated. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 3, 2010 153 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 150 Selecting ADR Process, Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/3/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
December 1, 2009 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 130 Motion to Dismiss (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
July 10, 2009 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 98 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
January 26, 2009 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 89 Motion for Discovery. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
December 18, 2008 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte CONTINUING hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment on Condition of Fees. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldberg v. Cameron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?