Campbell v. Flores

Case Number: 5:2005cv03563
Filed: September 2, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 34 Motion for Reconsideration. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
April 15, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009)
February 12, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 12 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; Denying 12 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing; Denying and Finding as Moot 12 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; Granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
November 12, 2008 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel Granting 6 Motion to Lift Stay and Re-Open Case; Order to Show Cause. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?