Rosa et al v. City of Seaside et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv03577
Filed: September 6, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2012 293 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd lifting stay and denying 287 Motion for Bond. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 7, 2012 292 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING 287 MOTION FOR DETERMINATION BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOWARD R. LLOYD. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/5/2012. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
March 3, 2010 283 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING MARCH 2, 2010, ORDER AND PRESERVING STAY OF IMPOSITION OF COSTS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/3/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 2, 2010 281 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY OF IMPOSITION OF COSTS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/2/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
February 16, 2010 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANT'S RECOVERY OF COSTS, Motions terminated: 269 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/16/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
December 17, 2009 274 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/17/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
November 20, 2009 263 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/20/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
October 27, 2009 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND FOR SANCTIONS AND (2) DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/27/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 15, 2009 223 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR RESERVATION OF COURTROOM WITH AUDIO-VISUAL EQUIPMENT re 218 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/9/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
July 20, 2009 189 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED MODIFICATION OF THE COURT'S SCHEDULING ORDER re 187 . Jury Trial set for 12/4/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose.. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/16/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2009)
March 18, 2009 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 159 Dismissing Complaint Against Defendants City of Seaside, Matthew Doza, Nick Borges, Dan Charlton and Anthony J Sellecito with prejudice. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/18/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
March 16, 2009 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 157 JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/16/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 6, 2009 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF HOLLY ROSA, AN ADULT, AS PARTY PLAINTIFF IN PLACE OF TAMMY HIKE, AS HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM re 155 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/27/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
March 26, 2007 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO DISMISS THE MATTER WITH PREJUDICE re 119 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by City of Monterey,, Motions terminated:. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/26/07. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2007)
March 15, 2007 118 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 117 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by Monterey County Sheriff's Department,, County of Monterey,, Joe Palazzolo,, Mike Kanalakis,, Irons,. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/15/07. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosa et al v. City of Seaside et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?