In re HP INKJET PRINTER LITIGATION

Case Number: 5:2005cv03580
Filed: September 6, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2014 347 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/14/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
September 30, 2014 345 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) GRANTING 330 RENEWED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; (2) GRANTING IN PART 329 RENEWED MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS; AND (3) DENYING 338 OBJECTORS' MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE CLASS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, DISQUALIFY CLASS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/30/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
August 26, 2014 344 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SUBMITTING 338 MOTION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT AND VACATING SEPTEMBER 5, 2014 HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/26/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
June 20, 2011 310 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING OBJECTORS' APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS AND EXPENSES. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on June 20, 2011. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
March 29, 2011 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 261 PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS AND EXPENSES, AND APPROVAL OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVES' STIPENDS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on March 29, 2011. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
October 1, 2010 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING 258 CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES, PROVISIONALLY CERTIFYING A NATIONWIDE SETTLEMENT CLASS, APPROVING PROPOSED NOTICE, AND SCHEDULING FAIRNESS HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/1/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
August 9, 2010 251 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE PROPOSED PLAN FOR FILING SETTLEMENT PAPERS AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT re (60 in 5:07-cv-00333-JF), (250 in 5:05-cv-03580-JF). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/3/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
July 15, 2010 249 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 248 THE JOINT STIPULATION RE PROPOSED PLAN FOR FILING SETTLEMENT PAPERS AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/15/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
June 11, 2010 247 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 246 THE JOINT STIPULATION RE PROPOSED PLAN FOR FILING SETTLEMENT PAPERS AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/7/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
April 8, 2010 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 243 THE JOINT STIPULATION RE APRIL 9, 2010 STATUS CONFERENCE AND PROPOSED PLAN FOR FILING SETTLEMENT PAPERS AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/7/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
January 6, 2010 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 237 THE JOINT STIPULATION RE CONTINUATION OF HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF A CALIFORNIA CLASS. The Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2010 is CONTINUED to 2/5/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/6/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
October 27, 2009 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 222 STIPULATION REQUESTING FURTHER MODIFICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE: MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF CALIFORNIA CLASS. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/22/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
August 14, 2009 212 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 210 Re Modification of Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Motion for Certification of a California Class. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2009 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/11/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
July 6, 2009 209 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 207 THE JOINT STIPULATION RE MODIFICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF A CALIFORNIA CLASS. Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/6/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
May 19, 2009 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 202 THE JOINT STIPULATION RE MODIFICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF A CALIFORNIA CLASS. The hearing on the Motion for Class Certification is CONTINUED to 9/18/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/19/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
April 16, 2009 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 190 , 194 GRANTING MOTION to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/9/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
February 5, 2009 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONFIRMING THE COURT'S SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION (granting 176 ). (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
January 14, 2009 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 178 STIPULATION REQUESTING FURTHER MODIFICATION OF HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE: MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF CALIFORNIA CLASS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/14/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
September 26, 2008 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 174 STIPULATION REQUESTING MODIFICATION OF HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION OF CALIFORNIA CLASS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/26/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re HP INKJET PRINTER LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?