CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC et al v. Google Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiffs claim that defendant Google Inc. misled AdWords advertisers by allowing advertising charges to exceed daily budgets that advertisers set for their ad campaigns.

Additional Resources

Plaintiff: CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC and Howard Stern
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 5:2005cv03649
Filed: September 12, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2010 360 MOTION to Intervene as plaintiffs under FRCP 24(A), 24(B) by Intervener's Patrick J. Simpson, R. Galiett, I. Akpan, A. Cowley, R. Jonathan Lee, M. Alvarado, G. Barbour, M. Shelly, E. Whitlow, J. Laube from FMC LEXINGTON, FEDERAL MEDICAL CENTER,P.O. BOX 14500, LEXINGTON, KY 40512 (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010) Modified on 8/18/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2010 359 Featured Case ORDER of USCA Appellees motion to dismiss the appeal is denied without prejudice to renewing the arguments in the answering brief. See Natl Indus. v. Republic Natl Life Ins. Co., 677 F.2d 1258, 1262 (9th Cir. 1982) (stating that merits panel may consider appellate jurisdiction despite earlier denial of motion to dismiss). The briefing schedule established previously shall remain in effect. as to 350 Notice of Appeal, filed by Matthew Weiss (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
November 25, 2009 358 CERTIFICATE OF RECORD with Court Reporter's Signature re 350 Notice of Appeal, Related document 357 Certificate of Record. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2009) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2009 357 Certificate of Record forwarded to USCA re appeal 350 Notice of Appeal, 356 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form : (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
November 6, 2009 356 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 9/14/09 before Judge James Ware, 348 Minutes, 349 Reporter Transcript. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 3, 2009 355 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 34611038543 re 350 Notice of Appeal filed by Matthew Weiss related document 354 (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009) Modified on 11/5/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2009 354 CLERK'S NOTICE Returned Check - First Notice of Payment Due re: 350 Notice of Appeal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
October 27, 2009 353 USCA Case Number 09-17380 9th Circuit Court of Appeals for 350 Notice of Appeal filed by Matthew Weiss. The schedule is set as follows: CADS due by Attorney Alan J. Sherwood due on 10/14/2009. Transcript due for Orig Clerk USDC, San Jose on 12/14/2009. Certificate of record due 12/21/2009. Appellant Weiss & Associates, PC opening brief due 01/29/2010. Appellee CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Appellee Google Inc. and Appellee Howard Stern answering brief due 03/01/2010. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 27, 2009 352 Statement re 350 Notice of Appeal Representative Statement by Matthew Weiss. (Sherwood, Alan) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 15, 2009 351 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 350 Notice of Appeal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 14, 2009 350 NOTICE OF APPEAL Fee Paid on 11/3/09 as to 346 Order on Motion for Settlement, 347 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees by Matthew Weiss. Filing fee $ 455. Appeal Record due by 11/13/2009. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009) Modified on 11/5/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2009 349 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/14/09, before Judge Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 10/19/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/28/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2009. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 9/30/2009) Modified on 11/9/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2009 348 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/14/2009 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 9/14/2009) re 340 MOTION for Attorney Fees AND EXPENSES AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVE INCENTIVE COMPENSATION AWARDS, 339 MOTION for Final Approval of class action certification and settlement. The Court issued an Order following the hearing. Please see the Court's Order 346 for further specifics. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/14/2009)
September 14, 2009 347 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING AWARD of Attorneys and Expenses, and Class Representative Incentive Compensation Award. by Judge James Ware granting 340 Motion for Attorney Fees (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009) Modified on 9/15/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2009 346 FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge James Ware granting 339 Motion for Settlement (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009) Modified on 9/15/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2009 345 Joinder re 339 MOTION for Final Approval of class action certification and settlement by Google Inc.. (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
August 24, 2009 344 Declaration of Markham Sherwood re: dissemination of Notice of Pendency and proposed SETTLEMENT of class action and Settlement hearing and Report on requests for exclusion , 341 Response ( Non Motion ), Response ( Non Motion ) filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 340 , 339 , 341 ) (Black, Rachel) (Filed on 8/24/2009) Modified on 8/25/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2009 343 Declaration of Lester L. Levy in Support of 340 MOTION for Attorney Fees AND EXPENSES AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVE INCENTIVE COMPENSATION AWARDS, 339 MOTION; 341 Response ( Non Motion ), Response ( Non Motion ) filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 340 , 339 , 341 ) (Black, Rachel) (Filed on 8/24/2009) Modified on 8/25/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2009 342 Declaration of Rachel S. Black in Support of 340 MOTION for Attorney Fees AND EXPENSES AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVE INCENTIVE COMPENSATION AWARDS, 339 MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION CERTIFICATION AND SETTLEMENT, 341 Response ( Non Motion ), Response ( Non Motion ) filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 340 , 339 , 341 ) (Black, Rachel) (Filed on 8/24/2009) Modified on 8/25/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2009 341 RESPONSE TO CLASS MEMBER OBJECTIONS by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Black, Rachel) (Filed on 8/24/2009) Modified on 8/25/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2009 340 MOTION for Attorney Fees AND EXPENSES AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVE INCENTIVE COMPENSATION AWARDS filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2009 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Black, Rachel) (Filed on 8/24/2009) Modified on 8/25/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2009 339 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION CERTIFICATION AND SETTLEMENT filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2009 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Motion, # 2 Proposed Final Judgment, # 3 Exhibit A to Proposed Final Judgment)(Black, Rachel) (Filed on 8/24/2009) Modified on 8/25/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2009 338 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Patricia V. Trumbull denying 333 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 334 Motion to Shorten Time.(cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
August 10, 2009 337 Reply to Opposition re 334 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Objector Depositions filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shih, Daniel) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
August 10, 2009 336 Opposition to [proposed] 8/11/09 hearing re: 334 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Objector Depositions by Randy R. Lyons, Chase Thompson. (Miller, Steve) (Filed on 8/10/2009) Modified text on 8/13/2009,(counsel used incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2009 335 NOTICE by Matthew Weiss re 329 Objection of Scrivener's Errors (Sherwood, Alan) (Filed on 8/6/2009)
August 5, 2009 334 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Objector Depositions filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Daniel J. Shih)(Shih, Daniel) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
August 4, 2009 333 MOTION to Compel Depositions of Objectors Randy R. Lyons, Chase Thompson, Etech Digital Playroom, Inc., and Universal Pro Audio, LLC, filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Daniel J. Shih, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F)(Shih, Daniel) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
July 15, 2009 332 NOTICE of Change of Address by Alan J Sherwood (Sherwood, Alan) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
July 14, 2009 331 OBJECTIONS to re 319 Order on Motion for Settlement by Forrest Jenkins. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 14, 2009 329 OBJECTIONS to re 319 Order on Motion for Settlement by Matthew Weiss. (Sherwood, Alan) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 14, 2009 328 OBJECTIONS to Letter from Willem F. Jonckheer to Daralyn Durie Regarding Proposed Settlement by Hal K. Levitte. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 13, 2009 330 OBJECTIONS to re 319 Order on Motion for Settlement by Harry Virgil Tootle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit declaration, # 2 Exhibit proof of service)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2009)
July 10, 2009 327 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File #326 and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 10, 2009 326 OBJECTIONS to re 319 Order on Motion for Settlement by Randy R. Lyons, Chase Thompson, Universal Pro Audio, LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2009 325 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER. Motion to Intervene by "Bernard Madoff d/b/a Jonathan Lee Riches" as Plaintiff and for leave to file a Brief of Amicus Curiae is DENIED.Signed by Judge James Ware on June 19, 2009. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009) Modified on 7/10/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2009 324 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 322 Motion for Leave to File; denying 322 Motion to Intervene by "Bernard Madoff d/b/a Jonathan Lee Riches" as Plaintiff and for leave to file a Brief of Amicus Curiae is DENIED. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009) Modified on 7/10/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2009 323 Memorandum in Opposition re 322 MOTION to Intervene MOTION for Leave to File Joint Memorandum in Opposition filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Black, Rachel) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 15, 2009 322 MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiff under Rule 24(a)1, 24(b), MOTION for Leave to File filed a Brief of Amicus Curiae by Bernard Madoff. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
June 12, 2009 321 Letter from Thaddeus Pedzich. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
May 12, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 12, 2009 319 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 315 Motion for Settlement (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 12, 2009 318 Amended [Proposed] Order re 315 MOTION Certifying Settlement Class and granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Black, Rachel) (Filed on 5/12/2009) Modified on 5/12/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2009 320 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/11/2009 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 5/11/2009) re 315 MOTION for Settlement. Final Approval Hearing set for 9/14/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see the Court's Order 319 for further specifics.(Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/11/2009)
April 1, 2009 317 Joinder re 315 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, PROVISIONAL CERTIFICATION OF NATIONWIDE SETTLEMENT CLASS, AND APPROVAL OF PROCEDURE FOR AND FORM OF NOTICE; AND MEMORANDUM I by Google Inc.. (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
March 26, 2009 316 Declaration of Rachel S. Black in Support of 315 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, PROVISIONAL CERTIFICATION OF NATIONWIDE SETTLEMENT CLASS, AND APPROVAL OF PROCEDURE FOR AND FORM OF NOTICE; AND MEMORANDUM I filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Related document(s) 315 ) (Black, Rachel) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
March 26, 2009 315 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, PROVISIONAL CERTIFICATION OF NATIONWIDE SETTLEMENT CLASS, AND APPROVAL OF PROCEDURE FOR AND FORM OF NOTICE; AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Black, Rachel) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
February 6, 2009 314 ASSOCIATION of Counsel Notice of Association of Counsel by Google Inc.. (Farzan, Farschad) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 6, 2009 313 Proposed Order re 312 MOTION to Withdraw Google, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Docket Numbers 299, 302 and 303 by Google Inc.. (Farzan, Farschad) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 6, 2009 312 MOTION to Withdraw 299 , 302 and 303 Motions filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom #5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Farzan, Farschad) (Filed on 2/6/2009) Modified on 2/18/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2009 311 PROOF OF SERVICE notice of settlement (Farzan, Farschad) (Filed on 2/2/2009) Modified on 2/12/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2009 310 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (Farzan, Farschad) (Filed on 2/2/2009) Modified on 2/3/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2009 309 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/01/08, before Judge Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 2/17/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2009. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 23, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines: set pursuant to 308 Order. Close of All Discovery due by 3/2/2009. Last Date to Hear Dipositive Motions due by 4/6/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 23, 2009 308 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 305 Stipulation filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 23, 2009. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 12, 2009 307 MOTION to Continue Google Inc.'s Notice of Continuation of the Hearing Date for its Motion for an Accounting of Plaintiffs' Apparent Destruction of Relevant Documents and Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom #5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Farzan, Farschad) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 8, 2009 306 Declaration of David T. Biderman in Support of 305 Stipulation Declaration of David T. Biderman in Support of the Joint Stipulation to Change the Times Set in the Court's Amended December 8, 2008 Case Management Order filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 305 ) (Farzan, Farschad) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
January 8, 2009 305 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Change the Times Set in the Court's Amended December 8, 2008 Case Management Order and [Proposed] Order by Google Inc.. (Farzan, Farschad) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
January 6, 2009 304 NOTICE by Google Inc. Google Inc.'s Notice of Continuation of the Hearing Date for Its Motion for an Accounting of Plaintiffs' Apparent Destruction of Relevant Documents and Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories (Farzan, Farschad) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
December 22, 2008 303 Proposed Order re 299 MOTION for an Accounting of Plaintiffs' Apparent Destruction of Relevant Documents and Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories; by Google Inc.. (Farzan, Farschad) (Filed on 12/22/2008) Modified on 1/6/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2008 302 Declaration of Sang (Alvin) Lee in Support of 299 MOTION for an Accounting of Plaintiffs' Apparent Destruction of Relevant Documents and Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories; filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Errata N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R)(Related document(s) 299 ) (Farzan, Farschad) (Filed on 12/22/2008) Modified on 1/6/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2008 301 EXHIBITS A re 300 Declaration of Lee Declaration filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 300 ) (Farzan, Farschad) (Filed on 12/22/2008) Modified on 1/6/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2008 300 Declaration of Sang (Alvin) Lee in Support of 299 MOTION for an Accounting of Plaintiffs' Apparent Destruction of Relevant Documents and Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories. filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 299 ) (Farzan, Farschad) (Filed on 12/22/2008) Modified on 1/6/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2008 299 MOTION for an Accounting of Plaintiffs' Apparent Destruction of Relevant Documents and MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom #5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix of Discovery Requests)(Farzan, Farschad) (Filed on 12/22/2008) Modified on 1/6/2009,(counsel failed to select multiple motions.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2008 298 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 234 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
December 15, 2008 297 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Granting 291 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Docket Numbers 284, 285 and 286. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 15, 2008 296 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Granting 293 Google Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Docket Numbers 281, 282, 283, 289 and 290. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 9, 2008 295 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING A NEW DEADLINE FOR THE CLOSE OF ALL DISCOVERY AND LAST DATE FOR HEARING DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. Close of ALL Discovery set for 2/2/2009. Last Date to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 3/20/2009. Please see Order re Briefing schedule re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Anticipated Motion Hearing re Partial Summary Judgment set for 3/20/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/9/2008. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/9/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
December 9, 2008 294 Proposed Order re 293 MOTION to Withdraw Docket Numbers 281 , 282 , 283 , 289 , and 290 by Google Inc.. (Farzan, Farschad) (Filed on 12/9/2008) Modified on 12/10/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2008 293 Motion to Withdraw Docket Numbers 281 , 282 , 283 , 289 , and 290 without prejudice to re-file them at another date. filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom #5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Farzan, Farschad) (Filed on 12/9/2008) Modified on 12/10/2008,(counsel used incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/10/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2008 292 Featured Case *** FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE SEE 295 ***ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING A NEW DEADLINE FOR THE CLOSE OF ALL DISCOVERY AND LAST DATE FOR HEARING DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. Close of ALL Discovery set for 2/2/2009. Last Date to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 3/20/2009. Please see Order re Briefing schedule re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Anticipated Motion Hearing re Partial Summary Judgment set for 3/20/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/9/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008) Modified docket text on 12/9/2008 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2008 291 MOTION to Withdraw Motion 284 , Motion 285 , and Declaration of R. S. Black 286 filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Black, Rachel) (Filed on 12/5/2008) Modified on 12/5/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/10/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2008 290 Proposed Order re 284 MOTION to Seal Portions of Documents Due to Confidential Designations by Google Inc.. (Farzan, Farschad) (Filed on 12/4/2008) Modified text on 12/5/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2008 289 Declaration of David T. Biderman in Support of 284 MOTION to Seal Portions of documents filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 284 ) (Farzan, Farschad) (Filed on 12/4/2008) Modified text on 12/5/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2008 Received redacted version of declaration of R.S. Black. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
December 1, 2008 Received redacted version of the Notice of Motion and Motion to compel (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
December 1, 2008 Received Declaration (SUBMITTED) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
December 1, 2008 Received Motion (SUBMITTED) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
December 1, 2008 287 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern re 286 Declaration in Support, of Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Google, Inc.'s Answer to Interrogatories No. 4 and 5 and to Produce Documents in Response to Request for Produdction No. 29 (Black, Rachel) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
November 26, 2008 286 Declaration of Rachel S. Black in Support of 285 MOTION to Compel Google, Inc.'s Answer to Interrogatories No. 4 and 5 and to Produce Documents in Response to Request for Production No. 29 (NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING) item under seal filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Related document(s) 285 ) (Black, Rachel) (Filed on 11/26/2008) Modified text on 12/1/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2008 285 MOTION to Compel Google, Inc.'s Answer to Interrogatories No. 4 and 5 and MOTION to Produce Documents in Response to Request for Production No. 29 (NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING) Item Under Seal filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom #5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Black, Rachel) (Filed on 11/26/2008) Modified text on 12/1/2008,(counsel failed to select multiple motions.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2008 284 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Notice of Motion and Motion to compel filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Black, Rachel) (Filed on 11/26/2008) Modified text on 12/1/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2008 283 Proposed Order re 281 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories; and Motion for an Accounting of Plaintiffs' Apparent Destruction of Relevant Documents by Google Inc.. (Farzan, Farschad) (Filed on 11/25/2008) Modified on 11/26/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2008 282 Declaration of Sang (Alvin) Lee in Support of 281 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories; and Motion for an Accounting of Plaintiffs' Apparent Destruction of Relevant Documents. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R)(Related document(s) 281 ) (Farzan, Farschad) (Filed on 11/25/2008) Modified on 11/26/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2008 281 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories; and Motion for an Accounting of Plaintiffs' Apparent Destruction of Relevant Documents and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom #5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Discovery Requests in Support of its Motion for an Accounting of Plaintiffs' Apparent Destruction of Relevant Documents and Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories (L.R. 37-2))(Farzan, Farschad) (Filed on 11/25/2008) Modified on 11/26/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2008 280 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING Revised Order re 273 Order re 258 Administrative Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Documents Due to Confidential Designations. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/25/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 18, 2008 273 REVISED [Proposed] Order re 258 Administrative Motion Under Local Rule 79-5(d) for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Documents Due to Confidential Designations by Defendant Google, Inc. by Google Inc.. (Jhang, M.) (Filed on 11/18/2008) Modified on 11/19/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2008 272 Declaration of David T. Biderman in Support of 258 Motion to Seal Portions of Documents Due to Confidential Designations by Defendant Google, Inc. filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 258 ) (Jhang, M.) (Filed on 11/18/2008) Modified on 11/19/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2008 271 Featured Case ORDER Granting 238 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/18/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 18, 2008 270 Featured Case ORDER Granting 266 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/18/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 18, 2008 Received REDACTED Version reply (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 17, 2008 279 Declaration of F. Farzen (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 17, 2008 278 Declaration of F. Farzen (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 17, 2008 277 Reply (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 17, 2008 276 Reply (UNDER SEAL) pursuant to 270 order (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 17, 2008 Received Declaration (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 17, 2008 Received REDACTED Version Declaration (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 17, 2008 Received Reply (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 17, 2008 269 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 262 Reply to Opposition, 264 Declaration in Support, 263 Reply to Opposition, 265 Declaration in Support, SEALED AND REDACTED VERSIONS (Jhang, M.) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 17, 2008 268 Proposed Order re 266 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' "120% Rule and "Partial Month" Claims by Google Inc.. (Jhang, M.) (Filed on 11/17/2008) Modified text on 11/18/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2008 267 Declaration of DAVID T. BIDERMAN in Support of 266 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' "120% Rule and "Partial Month" Claims filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 266 ) (Jhang, M.) (Filed on 11/17/2008) Modified text on 11/18/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2008 266 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' "120% Rule" and "Partial Month" Claims and exhibits 6 and 7 to the declaration filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Jhang, M.) (Filed on 11/17/2008) Modified text on 11/18/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2008 265 REDACTED DOCUMENT re: Declaration of FARSCHAD FARZAN in Support of 263 Reply of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' "120% Rule" and "Partial Month" Claims ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal) filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 263 ) (Jhang, M.) (Filed on 11/17/2008) Modified text on 11/18/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2008 264 Declaration of FARSCHAD FARZAN in Support of 262 Reply in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' "120% Rule" and "Partial Month" Claims ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal) filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 262 ) (Jhang, M.) (Filed on 11/17/2008) Modified text on 11/18/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2008 263 REDACTED DOCUMENT re Reply in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' "120% Rule" and "Partial Month" Claims ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal) filed by Google Inc.. (Jhang, M.) (Filed on 11/17/2008) Modified text on 11/18/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2008 262 Reply in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' "120% Rule" and "Partial Month" Claims ***NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING*** (Items Under Seal) filed by Google Inc.. (Jhang, M.) (Filed on 11/17/2008) Modified text on 11/18/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2008 259 Joint Case Management Statement Pursuant to 248 October 2, 2008 Order Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Google Inc.. (Jhang, M.) (Filed on 11/13/2008) Modified on 11/18/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2008 258 Featured Case ORDER Granting 251 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/13/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
November 12, 2008 257 Featured Case ORDER Granting 256 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document, Docket Item No. 252. Signed by by Judge James Ware on 11/12/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 11, 2008 256 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Docket Item No. 252 filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Black, Rachel) (Filed on 11/11/2008)
November 10, 2008 261 Declaration of R. S. Black (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 10, 2008 260 MEMORANDUM in Opposition (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 10, 2008 255 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern re Received Document, Received Document (Black, Rachel) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 10, 2008 Received Declaration of R. S. Black (SUBMITTED) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 10, 2008 Received Opposition (SUBMITTED) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 10, 2008 254 Opposition to Google Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING (Item Under Seal) (Black, Rachel) (Filed on 11/10/2008) Modified text on 11/10/2008***(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity. The MFN is meant to be a place-holder for the real filing, NOT an event unto itself.***) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2008 253 Declaration of Rachel S. Black in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Google, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING) (Black, Rachel) (Filed on 11/10/2008) Modified text on 11/10/2008***(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity. The MFN is meant to be a place-holder for the real filing, NOT an event unto itself.***) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2008 252 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 254 . *** NOTICE by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern Notice of Manual Filing of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Google Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Black, Rachel) (Filed on 11/10/2008) Modified on 11/10/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/10/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Pursuant to Order 257 , document removed. Modified on 11/12/2008 (sp, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2008 251 MOTION to Seal Portions of plaintiff's Opposition and Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of R. S. Black Due to Confidential Designations by Defendant Google, Inc. filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Black, Rachel) (Filed on 11/10/2008) Modified on 11/10/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2008 250 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing re 234 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS' "120% RULE" AND "PARTIAL MONTH" CLAIMS. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2008 09:00 AM, Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 6, 2008 249 Featured Case ORDER Granting 246 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephen Susman. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/6/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 2, 2008 248 Featured Case ORDER Continuing Case Mangement Conference from 10/6/2008 to 11/10/2008. The hearing set for 11/21/2008 is VACATED. The parties shall be prepared to set a new hearing date re Motion for Class Certification. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/2/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
September 30, 2008 247 Proposed Order re 246 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stephen D. Susman by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 246 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stephen D. Susman ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611003975.) filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 26, 2008 245 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 244 Case Management Statement PROOF OF SERVICE (Jhang, M.) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 26, 2008 244 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT PURSUANT TO JUNE 17, 2008 ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Google Inc.. (Jhang, M.) (Filed on 9/26/2008) Modified text on 9/29/2008,(to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2008 275 Declaration of A. Samet (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 8, 2008 243 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. PROOF OF SERVICE (Jhang, M.) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 8, 2008 Received Document Redacted Declaration of A. Samet. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 5, 2008 Received Document Redacted Declaration of A. Samet.(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 5, 2008 Received Document Declaration of A. Samet (Submitted) under seal(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 5, 2008 242 Featured Case ORDER Granting 232 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Rachel S. Black. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/5/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 5, 2008 241 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 234 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS' "120% RULE" AND "PARTIAL MONTH" CLAIMS; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT, 236 Proposed Order, 235 Declaration in Support, 240 Proposed Order, 239 Declaration in Support, 237 Declaration in Support, 238 MOTION to Seal Document (Jhang, M.) (Filed on 9/5/2008) Modified on 9/8/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2008 240 Proposed Order re 238 MOTION to Seal Document by Google Inc.. (Jhang, M.) (Filed on 9/5/2008) Modified on 9/8/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2008 239 Declaration of David T. Biderman in Support of 238 MOTION to Seal filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 238 ) (Jhang, M.) (Filed on 9/5/2008) Modified on 9/8/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2008 238 MOTION to Seal Document 237 Declaration of Adam Samet in Support,of ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS' "120% RULE" AND PARTIAL MONTH" CLAIMS filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Jhang, M.) (Filed on 9/5/2008) Modified on 9/8/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2008 237 Declaration of Adam Samet in Support of 234 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING item under seal filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 234 ) (Jhang, M.) (Filed on 9/5/2008) Modified on 9/8/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2008 236 Proposed Order re 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment GOOGLE INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS' "120% RULE" AND "PARTIAL MONTH" CLAIMS; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT by Google Inc.. (Jhang, M.) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 5, 2008 235 Declaration of David T. Biderman in Support of 234 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS' "120% RULE" AND "PARTIAL MONTH" CLAIMS; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 234 ) (Jhang, M.) (Filed on 9/5/2008) Modified on 9/8/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2008 234 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS' "120% RULE" AND "PARTIAL MONTH" CLAIMS; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Jhang, M.) (Filed on 9/5/2008) Modified on 9/8/2008,(counsel used incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2008 233 Proposed Order re 232 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Rachel S. Black by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
September 2, 2008 232 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Rachel S. Black ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611003828.) filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
August 5, 2008 274 Declaration of A. Samet (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2008)
July 7, 2008 231 Featured Case ORDER re 230 229 Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 7/7/08. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 7/7/2008)
July 2, 2008 230 Brief Plaintiffs' Brief re Discovery Plan filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 7/2/2008)
July 2, 2008 229 Brief Google Inc.'s Discovery Brief filed byGoogle Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 7/2/2008)
June 25, 2008 228 Featured Case ORDER Re Discovery Planning. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 6/24/08. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 6/25/2008)
June 17, 2008 227 Featured Case ORDER Following Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due 9/26/2008. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2008 10:00 AM, Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/17/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
June 16, 2008 226 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/16/2008 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 6/16/2008). Further Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2008 10:00 AM, Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/16/2008)
June 5, 2008 225 Featured Case ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference from 6/9/2008 to 6/16/2008. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/5/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2008)
June 2, 2008 224 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement and Proposed Order Pursuant to N.D. L.R. 16-9 filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern, Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
May 14, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: pursuant to 223 Order. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/30/2008. Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2008)
May 14, 2008 223 Featured Case ORDER re 202 Brief filed by Google Inc., 205 Brief filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. Signed by Judge James Ware on 05/14/08. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2008)
April 22, 2008 222 Featured Case ORDER Granting 221 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel Shih. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/22/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
April 18, 2008 Proposed Order re 221 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel Shih (( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611002992.) by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2008)
April 18, 2008 221 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel Shih ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611002992.) filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2008)
March 26, 2008 220 Supplemental Declaration in Support of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Partial Summary Judgment (Under Seal) filed byGoogle Inc.. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2008)
March 26, 2008 219 Opposition To Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Partial Summary Judgment (Under Seal) filed byGoogle Inc.. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2008)
March 25, 2008 218 Featured Case ORDER Granting 120 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/25/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2008)
March 25, 2008 217 Featured Case ORDER Granting 137 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/25/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2008)
March 25, 2008 216 Featured Case ORDER Granting 163 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/25/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2008)
March 25, 2008 215 Featured Case ORDER Granting 179 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/25/2008 (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2008)
March 25, 2008 214 Featured Case ORDER Granting 147 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/25/2008 (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2008)
March 20, 2008 213 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/26/08 before Judge James Ware. Court Reporter: Jana L. Ridenour.. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2008)
February 26, 2008 212 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/26/2008 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 2/26/2008) re 202 Opening Brief by Defendant Google Inc. Regarding the 120% Rule filed byGoogle Inc; 205 Brief Plaintiffs' Supplemental Submission Re The Court's Order of August 21, 2007 filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. The Court took the matter under submission after oral argument. The Court to issue further order on motion. (Court Reporter Jana Ridenour.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/26/2008)
February 20, 2008 211 Featured Case ORDER Continuing Hearing on Motion from 2/25/2008 to 2/26/2008 re 202 Opening Brief by Defendant Google Inc. Regarding the 120% Rule; 205 Brief Plaintiffs' Supplemental Submission Re The Court's Order of August 21, 2007. The Court continues the hearing to give the parties sufficient time for argument. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/20/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2008)
February 11, 2008 210 Objection to the 204 Declaration of Heather Wilburn in Support of Google, Inc.'s Opening Brief Regarding the 120% Rule filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Related document(s) 208 ) (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 2/11/2008) Modified on 2/12/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2008 209 Declaration of Marc M. Seltzer in Support of 208 Brief Supplemental Declaration of Marc M. Seltzer in Support of Plaintiffs' Brief in Response to Google, Inc.'s Opening Brief Re the Court's Order of August 21, 2007 filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Related document(s) 208 ) (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
February 11, 2008 208 Brief in Response to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Opening Brief Re The Court's 193 Order of August 21, 2007 filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 2/11/2008) Modified on 2/12/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2008 207 Response to Plaintiffs' 205 Supplemental Submission re The Court's Order of August 21, 2007 filed by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 2/11/2008) Modified on 2/11/2008(counsel failed to link to which document relates to) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2008 206 Declaration of Marc M. Seltzer in Support of 205 Brief of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Submission Re The Court's Order of August 21, 2007 filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, Part 1, # 4 Exhibit C, Part 2, # 5 Exhibit D, Part 1, # 6 Exhibit D, Part 2, # 7 Exhibit D, Part 3, # 8 Exhibit D, Part 4, # 9 Exhibit D, Part 5, # 10 Exhibit D, Part 6, # 11 Exhibit E, # 12 Exhibit F, # 13 Exhibit G, # 14 Exhibit H, # 15 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 205 ) (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 1/29/2008)
January 29, 2008 205 Brief Plaintiffs' Supplemental Submission Re The Court's Order of August 21, 2007 filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 1/29/2008)
January 29, 2008 204 Declaration of Heather Wilburn in Support of 202 Brief of Google Inc. Regarding 120% Rule filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Heather Wilburn)(Related document(s) 202 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 1/29/2008)
January 29, 2008 203 Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang in Support of 202 Brief of Google Inc. Regarding 120% Rule filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang, # 2 Exhibit B to Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang, # 3 Exhibit C to Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang, # 4 Exhibit D to Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang, # 5 Exhibit E to Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang)(Related document(s) 202 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 1/29/2008)
January 29, 2008 202 Opening Brief by Defendant Google Inc. Regarding the 120% Rule filed byGoogle Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 1/29/2008) Modified on docket text to match PDF caption 1/30/2008 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2007 201 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/3/2007 before James Ware (Date Filed: 12/3/2007). The Court sets an anticipated motion hearing. The parties are to follow briefing in accordance to the Local Rules. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/3/2007)
November 29, 2007 200 ASSOCIATION of Counsel SUSMAN GODFREY L.L.P. by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Levy, Lester) (Filed on 11/29/2007)
November 27, 2007 199 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by David T. Biderman (Biderman, David) (Filed on 11/27/2007)
November 26, 2007 198 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern, Google Inc.. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 11/26/2007)
September 21, 2007 197 Featured Case ORDER re Defendant's request to withdraw order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/21/2007. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2007)
September 6, 2007 196 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Continuance of Case Management Conference from 9/17/2007 to 12/3/2007 re 195 Stipulation filed by Google Inc., CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2007 10:00 AM Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/6/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2007)
September 5, 2007 195 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Case Management Conference by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern, Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 9/5/2007)
August 22, 2007 194 Joint Undisputed List of Pending Motions to Seal pursuant to the Court's 8/20/07 order by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern, Google Inc. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 8/22/2007) Modified text on 9/7/2007, to conform with document posted by counsel) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: re 193 Order. Joint Pretrial Statement due 9/7/2007. Preliminary Pretrial and Trial Setting Conference set for 9/17/2007 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2007)
August 21, 2007 193 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 80 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 85 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2007)
August 20, 2007 192 Featured Case ORDER re: Motions to Seal Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/20/07. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2007)
July 23, 2007 191 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/21/07, pages 1-53 before Judge James Ware. Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2007)
July 11, 2007 190 NOTICE of Change of Address by William M. Audet NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND UPDATED CONTACT INFORMATION (Audet, William) (Filed on 7/11/2007)
July 9, 2007 186 Featured Case ORDER Granting 140 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/9/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2007)
July 9, 2007 185 Featured Case ORDER Granting 156 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/9/2007.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2007)
June 21, 2007 184 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/21/2007 before James Ware. Matters submitted. The Court to issue further order on Motions (Date Filed: 6/21/2007) re 80 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern, 85 First MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication filed by Google Inc. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/21/2007)
June 15, 2007 183 Proposed Order denying re [ 179 by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 6/15/2007) Modified text on 6/15/2007, (counsel failed to properly link) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2007 182 DECLARATION of Michele F. Raphael in Opposition to 179 MOTION to Seal Document filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Related document(s) 179 ) (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 6/15/2007) Modified text on 6/19/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2007 Received Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts (DOCUMENT SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL) by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2007)
June 12, 2007 181 Proposed Order re 179 MOTION to Seal Document 178 Statement of Non-Opposition ,i.e. Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts MOTION to Seal Document 178 Statement of Non-Opposition ,i.e. Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 6/12/2007)
June 12, 2007 180 Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang in Support of 179 MOTION to Seal Document 178 Statement of Non-Opposition ,i.e. Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts MOTION to Seal Document 178 Statement of Non-Opposition ,i.e. Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 179 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 6/12/2007)
June 12, 2007 179 MOTION to Seal Joint statement of Undisputed facts filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 6/12/2007) Modified on 6/15/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2007 178 MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION re: Joint Statement (submitted under seal)filed by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 6/12/2007) Modified on 6/15/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: re 177 Order. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2007)
June 6, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: re 177 Order. The parties shall file a joint statement of undisputed facts by 6/12/2007. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2007) Modified on 6/6/2007 (ecg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/7/2007 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2007 177 Featured Case ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/5/2007. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2007) Modified on 6/6/2007 (ecg, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 6/6/2007 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2007 176 DECLARATION of M. Christopher Jhang in response to plaintiff's opposition to defendants Administrative 156 Motion For Leave To File Documents Under Seal In Connection With Google Inc.'s Reply To Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition, filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 171 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 6/1/2007) Modified on 6/4/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2007 175 Proposed Order Regarding 174 Declaration Re: Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 79-5(d) to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Reply Memorandum, by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 6/1/2007) Modified on 6/4/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2007 174 Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang in response to 163 MOTION to Seal Pursuant to CIV. L.R. 79-5(d) Portions of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Reply Memorandum, filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 163 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 6/1/2007) Modified on 6/4/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2007 173 DECLARATION of M. Christopher Jhang in response to Opposition, to Google Inc.'s Administrative 147 Motion to File Documents Under Seal in Connection with Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum, (document # 154 155 filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 154 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/31/2007) Modified on 6/4/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2007 172 Proposed Order Denying 156 motion to seal by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 5/30/2007) Modified on 5/30/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2007 171 DECLARATION of Michele Raphael in Opposition to 156 First MOTION to Seal Document (Google's Reply to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment) filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Related document(s) 156 ) (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 5/30/2007)
May 29, 2007 189 Declaration filed by Error: party not known. (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2007)
May 29, 2007 170 Proposed Order granting 140 Plaintiffs' Third Motion to Seal Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 79-5(d) Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition Memorandum by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/29/2007) Modified on 5/30/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2007 169 DECLARATION of M. Christopher Jhang in response to 140 Third MOTION to Seal Pursuant to CIV. L.R. 79-5(d) Portions of plaintiff's Memo in opposition filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 140 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/29/2007) Modified on 5/30/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2007 Received Document (Supplemental reply memorandum in support of plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment) submitted under seal (Highlighted to identify redactions) by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2007)
May 29, 2007 Received Document (Supplemental reply memorandum in support of plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment) submitted under seal (redacted copy) by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2007)
May 29, 2007 168 Proposed Order Granting re 163 Second Motion to Seal Amended Supplemental Memorandum and Amended Supplemental Declaration of M.F. Raphael by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/29/2007) Modified on 5/30/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2007 167 DECLARATION of M. Christopher Jhang in response to 137 Second MOTION to Seal Pursuant to CIV. L.R. 79-5(d) Portions of the (Amended) Supplemental Memo Documents Due to Confidential Designations by Defendant Google, Inc. filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Errata A# 2 B)(Related document(s) 137 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/29/2007) Modified on 5/30/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2007 166 [Proposed Order] re: 137 Second MOTION to Seal (Amended) Supplemental Memorandum in support and portions of the amended supplemental declaration of M. F. Raphael filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit b)(Related document(s) 137 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/29/2007) Modified on 5/30/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2007 Received Document Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang in support to Reply to plaintiff's supplemental opposition to Google Inc's motion for summary judgment) by Google Inc. (Redacted Version submitted) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2007)
May 29, 2007 Received Document Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang in support to Reply to plaintiff's supplemental opposition to Google Inc's motion for summary judgment) by Google Inc. (submitted under seal) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2007)
May 29, 2007 Received Document (Reply to plaintiff's supplemental opposition to Google Inc's motion for summary judgment) by Google Inc. (submitted under seal) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2007)
May 29, 2007 165 Proposed Order re 163 MOTION to Seal Pursuant to CIV. L.R. 79-5(d) Portions of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Reply Memo Due to Confidential Designations by Defendant by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 5/29/2007)
May 29, 2007 164 Declaration of Michele Raphael in Support of 163 MOTION to Seal Pursuant to CIV. L.R. 79-5(d) Portions of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Reply Memo Due to Confidential Designations by Defendant filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Related document(s) 163 ) (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 5/29/2007)
May 29, 2007 163 MOTION to Seal Pursuant to CIV. L.R. 79-5(d) Portions of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memo filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 5/29/2007) Modified on 5/30/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2007 162 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of documents submitted under seal 157 159 160 161 by Google Inc. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/25/2007) Modified on 5/29/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2007 161 MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION OF supplemental declaration of M. C. Jhang in support of Reply to supplemental Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment submitted under seal filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 159 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/25/2007) Modified on 5/30/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2007 160 MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION re: Supplemental Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang(REDACTED VERSION) submitted under seal filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 159 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/25/2007) Modified on 5/29/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/30/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2007 159 MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION of reply to plaintiff's supplemental opposition submitted under seal filed by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/25/2007) Modified on 5/29/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/30/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2007 158 Proposed Order re 156 First MOTION to Seal Document (Google's Reply to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment) by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/25/2007)
May 25, 2007 157 Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang in Support of 156 First MOTION to Seal Document (Google's Reply to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 156 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/25/2007)
May 25, 2007 156 First MOTION to Seal Google's Reply to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment Exhibits A-C of the supplemental declaration of M. C. Jhang filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/25/2007) Modified on 5/30/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2007 155 Proposed Order Denying in part and granting in part re 147 motion for leave to file documents under seal by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 5/24/2007) Modified on 5/29/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2007 154 DECLARATION of Michele Raphael in Opposition to 147 First MOTION to Seal Document 146 Declaration in Opposition, to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Partial Summary Judgment filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Related document(s) 147 ) (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 5/24/2007)
May 22, 2007 151 Featured Case ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion Pursuant to CIV. L.R. 79-5(d) Portions of Documents Due to Confidential Designations by Defendant Google, Inc. re 114 Motion to Seal, 116 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge James Wareon 5/22/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2007)
May 21, 2007 188 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Error: party not known. (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 187 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Error: party not known.(UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 150 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 149 Proposed Order re 147 First MOTION to for leave to file under Seal by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/21/2007) Modified on 5/22/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2007 148 Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang in Support of 147 First MOTION to Seal filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 147 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/21/2007) Modified on 5/22/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2007 147 First MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Partial Summary Judgment; exhibits A,B,C,F,G, to the declaration of M.C. Jhang filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/21/2007) Modified on 5/22/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/30/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2007 146 MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION of Supplemental declaration of M. C. Jhang submitted under seal filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 143 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/21/2007) Modified on 5/22/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/29/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/30/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2007 145 MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION submitted document under seal REDACTED VERSION filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 143 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/21/2007) Modified on 5/22/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2007 144 DECLARATION of Leslie Altherr in Opposition to 143 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Partial Summary Judgment filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 143 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 143 MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION of document under seal Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Partial Summary Judgment filed by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/21/2007) Modified on 5/22/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2007 Received (Supplemental declaration of M. Christopher Jhang in support of opposition to plaintiff's supplemental memorandum in support of partial summary judgment) by Google Inc. (submitted under seal) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Received (Supplemental declaration of M. Christopher Jhang in support of opposition to plaintiff's supplemental memorandum in support of partial summary judgment) by Google Inc. (REDACTED version) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2007) Modified on 5/21/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2007 Received (opposition to plaintiff's supplemental memorandum in support of partial summary judgment) by Google Inc. (Submitted under seal) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 142 Proposed Order re 140 Third MOTION to Seal Pursuant to CIV. L.R. 79-5(d) Portions of Documents Due to Confidential Designations by Defendant Google, Inc. by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 141 Declaration of Michele F. Raphael in Support of 140 Third MOTION to Seal Pursuant to CIV. L.R. 79-5(d) Portions of Documents Due to Confidential Designations by Defendant Google, Inc. filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Related document(s) 140 ) (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 5/21/2007) Modified on 5/21/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2007 140 Third MOTION to Seal Pursuant to CIV. L.R. 79-5(d) Portions of the Memorandum in opposition to defendant supplemental brief in support of summary judgment by Defendant Google, Inc. filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 5/21/2007) Modified on 5/21/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/30/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2007 139 Proposed Order re 137 Second MOTION to Seal Pursuant to CIV. L.R. 79-5(d) Portions of Documents Due to Confidential Designations by Defendant Google, Inc. by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 138 Declaration of Michele F. Raphaelin Support of 137 Second MOTION to Seal Pursuant to CIV. L.R. 79-5(d) Portions of Documents Due to Confidential Designations by Defendant Google, Inc. filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Related document(s) 137 ) (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 5/21/2007) Modified on 5/21/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2007 137 Second MOTION to Seal Pursuant to CIV. L.R. 79-5(d) Portions of (Amended Supplemental Memorandum in support of plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment) by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC. (redacted) highlighted Documents Due to Confidential Designations by Defendant Google, Inc. filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 5/21/2007) Modified on 5/21/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/29/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2007 Received (Amended Supplemental Memorandum in support of plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment) by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC. (redacted) highlighted - submitted under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Received Supplemental declaration of Michele F. Raphael in support of partial summary judgment by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC. (redated) -submitted under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Received Supplemental declaration of Michele F. Raphael in support of partial summary judgment by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC. (redacted) highlighted - submitted under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Received Memorandum in opposition to defendant supplemental brief in support of summary judgment by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC. (Redacted) highlighted - submitted under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Received Memorandum in opposition to defendant supplemental brief in support of summary judgment by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC. (Redacted Copy) (submitted under seal) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Received (Amended Supplemental Memorandum in support of plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment) by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC. (redaction) (submitted under seal) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 16, 2007 136 NOTICE by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 5/16/2007)
May 15, 2007 135 Featured Case Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding Confidential Information. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 5/15/07. (cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2007)
May 14, 2007 134 Proposed Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 79-5(D) to File Under Seal Portions of Documents by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/14/2007)
May 14, 2007 133 EXHIBITS E to 128 Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang in Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 79-5(D) to File Under Seal Portions of Documents filed by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/14/2007) Modified on 5/15/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2007 132 EXHIBITS D to 128 Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang in Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 79-5(D) to File Under Seal Portions of Documents filed by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/14/2007) Modified on 5/15/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2007 131 EXHIBITS C to 128 Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang In Response To Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion Pursuant To Civ. L.R. 79-5(D) To File Under Seal Portions Of Documents filed by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/14/2007) Modified on 5/14/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2007 130 EXHIBITS B to 128 Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang In Response To Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion Pursuant To Civ. L.R. 79-5(D) To File Under Seal Portions Of Documents filed by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/14/2007) Modified on 5/14/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2007 129 EXHIBITS A to 128 Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang In Response To Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion Pursuant To Civ. L.R. 79-5(D) To File Under Seal Portions Of Documents filed by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/14/2007) Modified on 5/14/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2007 128 Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang In Response To Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 79-5(D) To File Under Seal Portions Of Documents filed by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/14/2007) Modified on 5/14/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2007 127 Proposed Order Denying re 120 motion for leave to file documents under seal by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 5/11/2007) Modified on 5/11/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2007 126 *** DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY *** (PLEASE see docket 125 Declaration in Opposition, by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 5/10/2007) Modified on 5/11/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/11/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2007 125 DECLARATION of Michele F. Raphael in Opposition to 120 First MOTION to Seal For Leave to File Documents Under Seal filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 120 ) (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 5/10/2007)
May 7, 2007 153 SUPPLEMENTAL Declaration of Michele F. Raphael in Support of 80 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC. (Related document(s) 80 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2007) (UNDER SEAL)
May 7, 2007 152 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN support of plaintiff's 80 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2007) (UNDER SEAL)
May 7, 2007 124 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of documents submitted under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2007)
May 7, 2007 123 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern of REDACTED AND THE UNREDACTED copy submitted under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2007)
May 7, 2007 Received Document (supplemental declaration of Michaele F. Raphael in support of plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment) by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (submitted under seal)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2007)
May 7, 2007 Received Document (supplemental memorandum in support of plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment) by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (submitted under seal) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2007)
May 7, 2007 Received Document (REDACTED) supplemental DECLARATION OF Michele F. Raphael in support of plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment) (REDACTED VERSION SUBMITTED) by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2007)
May 7, 2007 Received Document (REDACTED) supplemental memorandum in support of plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment) by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (REDACTED VERSION SUBMITTED) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2007)
May 7, 2007 Received Document (Supplemental Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang in support of Brief in support of summary judgment motion) (submitted under seal) by Google Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2007)
May 7, 2007 Received Document (Supplemental Brief in support of summary judgment motion) by Google Inc.. (submitted under seal) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2007)
May 7, 2007 122 Proposed Order re 120 First MOTION to Seal For Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/7/2007)
May 7, 2007 121 Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang in Support of 120 First MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 120 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/7/2007) Modified on 5/7/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2007 120 First MOTION to File Under Seal supplemental brief and supplemental declaration of M. C. Jhang filed by Google Inc. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/7/2007) Modified on 5/30/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2007 119 MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION (item submitted under seal (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/7/2007) Modified on 5/7/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/7/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2007 118 MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION (submitted under seal) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/7/2007) Modified text on 5/7/2007, counsel used incorrect event (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2007 117 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of documents submitted under seal by Google Inc. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/7/2007) Modified on 5/7/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2007 116 Proposed Order re 114 MOTION to Seal Pursuant to CIV. L.R. 79-5(d) Portions of Documents Due to Confidential Designations by Defendant Google, Inc. by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 5/7/2007)
May 7, 2007 115 Declaration of Michele F. Raphael in Support of 114 MOTION to Seal Pursuant to CIV. L.R. 79-5(d) Portions of Documents Due to Confidential Designations by Defendant Google, Inc. filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 114 ) (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 5/7/2007)
May 7, 2007 114 MOTION to Seal Pursuant to CIV. L.R. 79-5(d) Portions of Documents Due to Confidential Designations by Defendant Google, Inc. filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 5/7/2007)
March 15, 2007 113 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING HEARING on 80 Motion for partial summary judgment and 85 motion for summary judgment FROM 4/2/2007 TO 6/11/2007. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/15/2007. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2007) Modified on 3/16/2007 (ecg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/21/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2007 112 STIPULATION [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order)(Gitterman, Judith) (Filed on 3/2/2007)
February 8, 2007 111 Featured Case ORDER FOLLOWING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION re 85 First MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication filed by Google Inc. 80 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/8/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2007)
January 30, 2007 110 TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 1/22/07 before Judge James Ware, Court Reporter: Jana Ridenour. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2007)
January 22, 2007 109 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/22/2007 before James Ware. The Court took this matter under submission upon hearing oral arguments (Date Filed: 1/22/2007)(Court Reporter Jana Ridenour.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/22/2007)
November 15, 2006 Set/Reset Hearings: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 1/22/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2006)
November 14, 2006 108 Featured Case ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. Signed by Judge James Ware on November 14, 2006. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2006)
November 13, 2006 107 Reply Memorandum in Response to Court's Order to Show Cause Why the Case Should not be Remanded for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byGoogle Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 11/13/2006)
November 10, 2006 106 Reply Memorandum in RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 11/10/2006)
November 8, 2006 105 Declaration of Michele F. Raphael in Support of 104 Response to Order to Show Cause filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 104 ) (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 11/8/2006)
November 8, 2006 104 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 11/8/2006)
November 8, 2006 103 Declaration of Heather Wilburn in Support of 102 Response to Order to Show Cause filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 102 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 11/8/2006)
November 8, 2006 102 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 11/8/2006)
October 30, 2006 101 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2006)
October 23, 2006 100 Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Levy, Lester) (Filed on 10/23/2006)
October 23, 2006 99 Declaration of Heather Wilburn (in support of Google's Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Gitterman, Judith) (Filed on 10/23/2006)
October 23, 2006 98 Reply Memorandum Google's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication filed byGoogle Inc.. (Gitterman, Judith) (Filed on 10/23/2006)
October 16, 2006 97 Proposed Order re 85 First MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Levy, Lester) (Filed on 10/16/2006)
October 16, 2006 96 DECLARATION of Lester L. Levy in Opposition to 85 First MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 85 ) (Levy, Lester) (Filed on 10/16/2006)
October 16, 2006 95 Memorandum in Opposition re 85 First MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Levy, Lester) (Filed on 10/16/2006)
October 16, 2006 94 Declaration of Leslie Altherr in Support of 91 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 91 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 10/16/2006)
October 16, 2006 93 OBJECTIONS to re 83 Declaration in Support by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 10/16/2006)
October 16, 2006 92 OBJECTIONS to re 84 Declaration in Support, by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 10/16/2006)
October 16, 2006 91 Memorandum in Opposition re 80 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byGoogle Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 10/16/2006)
October 2, 2006 90 Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang in Support of 85 First MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 85 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 10/2/2006)
October 2, 2006 89 MEMORANDUM in Support re 85 First MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 85 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 10/2/2006)
October 2, 2006 88 Declaration of Michael Schulman in Support of 85 First MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 85 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 10/2/2006)
October 2, 2006 87 Declaration of Leslie Altherr in Support of 85 First MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 85 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 10/2/2006)
October 2, 2006 86 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 10/2/2006)
October 2, 2006 85 First MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 10/2/2006)
September 29, 2006 84 Declaration of CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC in Support of 80 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 80 ) (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 9/29/2006)
September 29, 2006 83 Declaration of Howard Stern in Support of 80 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 80 ) (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 9/29/2006)
September 29, 2006 82 Proposed Order re 80 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 9/29/2006)
September 29, 2006 81 Declaration of Michele F. Raphael in Support of 80 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I, Part 1 of 3# 10 Exhibit Part 2 of 3# 11 Exhibit I, Part 3 of 3# 12 Exhibit J, Part 1 of 7# 13 Exhibit J, Part 2 of 7# 14 Exhibit J, Part 3 of 7# 15 Exhibit J, Part 4 of 7# 16 Exhibit J, Part 5 of 7# 17 Exhibit J, Part 6 of 7# 18 Exhibit J, Part 7 of 7)(Related document(s) 80 ) (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 9/29/2006)
September 29, 2006 80 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 9/29/2006)
August 16, 2006 79 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME re 75 Proposed Order filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern, (jy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2006)
August 11, 2006 78 Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang in Support of 77 Response in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enlarge Time filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-D)(Related document(s) 77 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 8/11/2006)
August 11, 2006 77 RESPONSE in Support Defendant Google Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enlarge Time filed byGoogle Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 8/11/2006)
August 9, 2006 76 Supplemental to 74 Declaration of Michele F. Raphael in Support of 73 Motion to Enlarge Time filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 8/9/2006) Modified text on 8/16/2006, reflect link to motion. (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2006 75 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Enlarge Time by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 8/8/2006)
August 8, 2006 74 Declaration of Michele F. Raphael in Support of 73 Motion to Enlarge Time filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 8/8/2006) Modified text on 8/16/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2006 73 MOTION for Extension of Time to hear the Partial Summary Judgment Motion scheduled from 10/6/06 to 11/6/06. Plaintiff moving papers are to be filed by 9/1/06 filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 8/8/2006) Modified on 8/16/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2006 72 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Re 66 Defendant's Motion to Enlarge Time and Clarify Court Order (pvtlc1) (Filed on 8/1/2006)
July 28, 2006 71 Declaration of Leslie Altherr in Support of 60 Order Following June 27, 2006 Case Management Conference (Amended) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 60 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 7/28/2006)
July 28, 2006 70 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 66 First MOTION to Continue /Enlarge Time and Clarify Court Order filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC. (Audet, William) (Filed on 7/28/2006)
July 28, 2006 69 Memorandum in Opposition Motion to Enlarge Time & Clarify Court Order filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC. (Audet, William) (Filed on 7/28/2006)
July 26, 2006 68 Proposed Order re 66 First MOTION to Continue /Enlarge Time and Clarify Court Order by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 7/26/2006)
July 26, 2006 67 Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang in Support of 66 First MOTION to Continue /Enlarge Time and Clarify Court Order filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-H to Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang)(Related document(s) 66 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 7/26/2006)
July 26, 2006 66 First MOTION to Continue /Enlarge Time and Clarify Court Order filed by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 7/26/2006)
July 21, 2006 65 Featured Case ORDER re Letter Dated July 18, 2006 from Plaintiff's Counsel to Court. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 7/20/06. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 7/21/2006)
July 17, 2006 64 RESPONSE to Court's June 27, 2006 Order Following Case Management Conference (Declaration of Leslie Altherr) by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 7/17/2006)
July 13, 2006 63 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher M. Jhang (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 7/13/2006)
July 12, 2006 62 Defendant Google, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint byGoogle Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 7/12/2006)
June 27, 2006 60 Featured Case ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2006)
June 27, 2006 59 Featured Case ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' UNJUST ENRICHMENT CLAIM by Judge James Ware denying 52 Motion to Dismiss (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2006)
June 26, 2006 61 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/26/2006 before Judge James Ware. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2006 10:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter N/A.) (epb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/26/2006)
June 20, 2006 58 (corrected) ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' UNJUST ENRICHMENT CLAIM IN THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2006)
June 20, 2006 57 *** FILED IN ERROR *** (Please see corrected/amended ORDER 58 ) VACATING HEARING (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2006) Modified on 6/21/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2006 56 Reply to Opposition re 52 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Unjust Enrichment Claim in the Second Amended Complaint filed byGoogle Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 6/12/2006)
June 5, 2006 55 Proposed Order Denying Defendant Google, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Unjust Enrichment Claim in the Second Amended Complaint by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 6/5/2006)
June 5, 2006 54 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Unjust Enrichment Claim in the Second Amended Complaint filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 6/5/2006)
May 18, 2006 53 Proposed Order re 52 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Unjust Enrichment Claim in the Second Amended Complaint by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/18/2006)
May 18, 2006 52 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Unjust Enrichment Claim in the Second Amended Complaint filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 5/18/2006)
May 18, 2006 51 EXHIBITS re 47 Amended Complaint Exhibit B filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Related document(s) 47 ) (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 5/18/2006)
May 18, 2006 50 EXHIBITS re 47 Amended Complaint Exhibit A3 filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Related document(s) 47 ) (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 5/18/2006)
May 18, 2006 49 EXHIBITS re 47 Amended Complaint Exhibit A2 filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Related document(s) 47 ) (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 5/18/2006)
May 18, 2006 48 EXHIBITS re 47 Amended Complaint Exhibit 1A filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Related document(s) 47 ) (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 5/18/2006)
May 4, 2006 47 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Class Action Complaint against Google Inc.. Filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 5/4/2006)
April 12, 2006 46 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 30 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' unjust enrichment claim with leave to amend. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2006)
March 29, 2006 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference conducted on 3/29/06 by RWS. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2006)
March 23, 2006 45 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Including Joint Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Report, and Proposed Orders, Pursuant to N.D. L.R. 16-9) filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 3/23/2006)
March 20, 2006 44 Reply to Opposition re 30 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Unjust Enrichment Claim filed byGoogle Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 3/20/2006)
March 20, 2006 43 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 3/20/2006)
March 20, 2006 42 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 3/29/06 at 10:30 a.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2006)
March 9, 2006 41 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 3/9/2006)
March 9, 2006 40 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 3/9/2006)
March 9, 2006 39 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 3/9/2006)
February 21, 2006 38 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing hearing on Motion to Dismiss to 04/03/06 at 9:00am and advancing Case Management Conference up to the same date at 10:00am. Signed by Judge James Ware on 02/21/06. (mp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2006)
February 17, 2006 37 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Hearing Date for Motion to Dismiss and Advancing Case Management Conference by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 2/17/2006)
February 2, 2006 36 Proposed Order Denying Defendant Google, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Unjust Enrichment Claim by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 2/2/2006)
February 2, 2006 35 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Unjust Enrichment Claim filed byHoward Stern. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 2/2/2006)
February 2, 2006 34 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Unjust Enrichment Claim filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC. (Raphael, Michele) (Filed on 2/2/2006)
January 31, 2006 33 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2006 09:00 AM. (mp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2006)
January 5, 2006 32 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO MAY 1, 2006 AT 10:00AM. Signed by Judge James Ware on 01/05/06. (mp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2006)
January 3, 2006 31 Proposed Order re 30 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Unjust Enrichment Claim by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 1/3/2006)
January 3, 2006 30 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Unjust Enrichment Claim filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 1/3/2006)
December 22, 2005 29 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Initial Case Management Conference by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 12/22/2005)
December 12, 2005 28 Featured Case ORDER re 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michele Fried Raphael filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC,, Howard Stern,. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/12/95. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2005 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2005 27 Featured Case ORDER re 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Lester L. Levy filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC,, Howard Stern,. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/12/05. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2005 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2005 Remark - clerk mailed copy of order filed on 12/6/05 docket number #26 to Attorney Michele Fried Raphael along with the E-Filing registration form. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2005)
December 7, 2005 Remark - clerk mailed copy of order filed on 12/6/05 docket number #25 to Attorney Lester L. Levy along with E-Filing registration form. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2005)
December 6, 2005 26 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Atttorney Michele Fried Raphael (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2005)
December 6, 2005 25 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lester L. Levy (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2005)
December 5, 2005 Proposed Order re 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michele Fried Raphael by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2005)
December 5, 2005 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Michele Fried Raphael (fee paid) filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2005)
December 5, 2005 Proposed Order re 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Lester L. levy by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2005)
December 5, 2005 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lester L. Levy filed by CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC, Howard Stern. (fee paid) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2005)
November 28, 2005 22 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware finding as moot 14 Motion to Dismiss (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2005)
November 23, 2005 21 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/23/05. (mp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2005)
November 22, 2005 20 Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang in Support of 19 Stipulation and [Proposed] order for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Class Action Complaint filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 19 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 11/22/2005)
November 22, 2005 19 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Class Action Complaint by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 11/22/2005)
November 14, 2005 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against all defendants. Filed byCLRB Hanson Industries, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1# 2 Exhibit A2# 3 Exhibit A4# 4 Exhibit B)(Hagan, Ryan) (Filed on 11/14/2005)
October 12, 2005 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 14 First MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 15 Declaration in Support,, 16 Proposed Order, (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 10/12/2005)
October 12, 2005 16 Proposed Order re 14 First MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 15 Declaration in Support, Granting Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Google Inc.. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 10/12/2005)
October 12, 2005 15 Declaration of M. Christopher Jhang in Support of 14 First MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, part 1 of 3# 2 Exhibit A, part 2 of 3# 3 Exhibit A, part 3 of 3# 4 Exhibit B, part 1 of 1)(Related document(s) 14 ) (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 10/12/2005)
October 12, 2005 14 First MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2005 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Jhang, Christopher) (Filed on 10/12/2005)
September 23, 2005 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. Proof of Service of Standing Order Regarding Case Management in Civil Cases (Gitterman, Judith) (Filed on 9/23/2005)
September 16, 2005 Remark Clerk mailed copy of Reassignment Order to all parties of record. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2005)
September 16, 2005 12 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Ware for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Patricia V Trumbull remains as the referral Judge. Signed by Executive Committee on September 16, 2005. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2005)
September 15, 2005 11 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Google Inc.. (Gitterman, Judith) (Filed on 9/15/2005)
September 15, 2005 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2006 10:00 AM before Honorable James Ware. (cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2005)
September 15, 2005 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2005)
September 14, 2005 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. of Supplementary Material (Gitterman, Judith) (Filed on 9/14/2005)
September 14, 2005 8 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Google Inc.. (Gitterman, Judith) (Filed on 9/14/2005)
September 13, 2005 7 NOTICE by Google Inc. NOTICE OF FILING IN STATE COURT DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC.'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT (Gitterman, Judith) (Filed on 9/13/2005)
September 13, 2005 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re: Counsel for defendant Google, Inc.'s Failure to E-File the following docouments Notice of Removal, Disclosure Statement, Notice of No Related Cases and Proof of Service and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2005)
September 12, 2005 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2005)
September 12, 2005 5 Featured Case ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2006. Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2006 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 9/12/05. (Attachments: # 1 standing order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2005)
September 12, 2005 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 1 Notice of Removal, 2 Certificate of Interested Entities, 3 Notice (Other) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2005 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2005 3 NOTICE of NO related cases by Google Inc. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2005 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2005 2 Disclosure statement and Certificattion of Interested Entities or persons (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2005 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2005 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (No Process) (jury demand) from Superior Court County of Santa Clara. Their case number is 1-05-CV-046409. (Filing fee $250 receipt number 5513070). Exhibit A-1 (summons & complaint Filed by Google Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2005 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/24/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC et al v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLRB Hanson Industries, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Lee Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Stern
Represented By: Kevin Lee Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Michele Fried Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?