Wheelock v. Kernan
Case Number: 5:2005cv03878
Filed: September 26, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 136 Motion for Reconsideration (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 2/2/12. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 132 THIRD ORDER RE RECORD. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/19/11. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER RE RECORD. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/12/11. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER RE RECORD. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/8/11. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheelock v. Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?