Williams v. Carey

Case Number: 5:2005cv03891
Filed: September 27, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Petitioner's Request for Reconsideration and Rehearing. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/3/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
November 30, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 46 Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
March 24, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File a Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/23/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
January 5, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/5/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 30, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Traverse. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
October 27, 2008 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 24 Motion for Reconsideration; Further Scheduling Order. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?