Martinez et al v. Werner Co et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv03904
Filed: September 27, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for Dismissal with Prejudice re 54 Proposed Order filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. All deadlines, hearing or motions are terminated. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/27/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
December 17, 2008 51 Opinion or Order of the Court SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 2/20/2009 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/17/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 15, 2008 52 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER (CORRECTION OF 50 ): The parties are referred to Magistrate Judge Seeborg for a settlement conference. The parties shall contact Judge Seeborg's chambers within ten (10) days from the date of this Order to schedule a s ettlement conference. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2009 03:00 PM, Jury Selection set for 3/17/2009 09:00AM, Jury Trial set for 3/18/2009 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/15/2008.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 4, 2008 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 40 Motion to Compel (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez et al v. Werner Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?