Gaeta v. Perrigo Pharmaceuticals Company et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv04115
Filed: October 12, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2011 398 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING FILE. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/5/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
October 25, 2011 396 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Statement due by 12/2/2011. Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/25/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
May 4, 2011 388 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 6/17/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/4/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
March 23, 2011 382 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING 3/28/2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties shall submit a Joint Case Management Statement updating the Court on the status of the Supreme Court proceedings and provide a good faith proposed schedule on how this case should proceed.Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/29/2011. Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2011 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/23/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
February 23, 2011 378 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2011. Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/23/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
January 28, 2011 376 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN LIGHT OF NINTH CIRCUIT REMAND re 375 USCA Order. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2011. Case Management Conference set for 2/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/28/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
August 27, 2009 360 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING HEARING FOR PLAINTIFFS'MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re 357 Joint Case Management Statement. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 358 MOTION for Reconsideration re 330 Judgment. All briefing shall be completed on or before 10/19/2009. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/27/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
July 8, 2009 356 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN LIGHT OF NINTH CIRCUIT REMAND re 355 USCA Order. Joint Case Management Conference statement due by 8/21/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/8/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
March 20, 2009 344 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to defendants BASF and PAR pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(ii) re 343 Stipulation. The Clerk shall terminate the above named Defendants from the Docket. BASF Corporation and PAR Pharmaceutical Inc., terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/19/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
October 3, 2008 288 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Clerk shall strike Docket Item 276 from the Court Record. The Plaintiff SHALL file a REDACTED version of the opposition to motion to enforce and confirm settlement as a separate docket item by 10/6/008. The Court terminates Moti ons 281 and 283 as MOOT. Motions terminated: 281 MOTION for REDACTION of BASF settlement amount, 283 MOTION for Joinder in Plaintiffs' 281 Request for Redaction of Settlement Amount in Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Enfor ce and Confirm Settlement MOTION for Joinder in Plaintiffs' 281 Request for Redaction of Settlement Amount in Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Enforce and Confirm Settlement filed by BASF Corporation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/3/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2008 282 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: POTENTIAL LIENS. Signed by Judge James Ware on September 30, 2008. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 23, 2008 275 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFFS 142 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER RELATED TO DISCOVERY re 151 Stipulation filed by Perrigo Pharmaceuticals Company, Motions terminated: 142 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/23/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 3, 2008 257 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Show Cause Hearing; Setting Case Management Conference for 9/8/208 re 255 Letter filed by Perrigo Pharmaceuticals Company, 254 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Augustine Gaeta, Margarita Gaeta. Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/3/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaeta v. Perrigo Pharmaceuticals Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?