Wang v. Silver Wing Chinese Restaurant

Case Number: 5:2005cv04119
Filed: October 12, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 37 AUTHORIZING SUBPOENA FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S CONSUMER CREDIT REPORT signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/26/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 22, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 53 FOR THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO REMAIN IN EFFECT FOR 60 DAYS signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/21/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 6, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 45 Motion for TRO. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 5/19/09 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
April 16, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying without prejudice 35 Motion for TRO (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang v. Silver Wing Chinese Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?