Sangerman et al v. Theriault Enterprises Inc

Case Number: 5:2005cv04183
Filed: October 14, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 61 Ex Parte Application (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
August 25, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Execution issued in the amount of $81,094.36 against Theriault Inc. and Leon Theriault (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 21, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying as moot 48 Motion to Enforce Judgment. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
February 4, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Execution issued in the of $77,406.60 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sangerman et al v. Theriault Enterprises Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?