Allied Health Association, Inc. et al v. Arthrocare Corporation

Case Number: 5:2005cv04276
Filed: October 21, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2009 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/18/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
May 20, 2009 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting in part and denying in part 102 Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating 103 Motion to Exclude Expert (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
May 6, 2009 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on May 6, 2009. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
January 6, 2009 104 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL AND ORDER THEREON (approving document no. 101 ). Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2009 11:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 6/19/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/6/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allied Health Association, Inc. et al v. Arthrocare Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?