Decker v. Tramiel et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv04709
Filed: November 17, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 62 MOTION FOR REVIEW OF TAXED COSTS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/16/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
November 12, 2010 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING ADDITIONAL INFORMATION FROM THE TRUSTEE RE 62 PENDING MOTION FOR REVIEW OF TAXED COSTS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/12/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 26, 2008 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL DENYING 51 TRAMIEL'S MOTION FOR ORDER RELEASING LIEN ON HIS HOME. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Decker v. Tramiel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?