Robert H, Hansen v Conseco Insurance Company

Case Number: 5:2005cv04726
Filed: November 17, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2011 232 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL ORDER APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/12/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 11, 2011 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 225 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
August 3, 2011 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 224 on Notice of Amendments to the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/3/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
March 30, 2011 206 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 205 Adding Plaintiff Friou P. Jones as a Named Plaintiff and Class Representative. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/30/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 23, 2011 204 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 203 Rescheduling Hearing on Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/23/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
January 19, 2011 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 200 Vacating Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Setting a Hearing Date of 3/25/2011 for Preliminary Approval of Settlement: Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M.Whyte on 1/19/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
November 24, 2010 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving extension of schedule on motion for class certification.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
October 4, 2010 196 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 195 for Scheduling Class Certification Issues: Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/4/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
July 9, 2010 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 177 Motion to File Under Seal; granting 185 Motion to File Under Seal. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
June 29, 2010 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 177 Motion to File Documents Under Seal, requiring response from defendant Conseco. Signed by Judge Whyte on 6/29/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
April 15, 2010 176 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 174 for Scheduling Class Certification Issues: Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/15/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
February 2, 2010 172 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 170 Recommendation of Mediator, and for Scheduling Class Certification Issues: Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/2/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
November 17, 2009 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 166 Granting Limited Extension of Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/17/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
August 28, 2009 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 161 for Extension of Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification: Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/28/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
July 16, 2009 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 159 for Limited Extension of Class Certification Briefing and Hearing Schedule: Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/16/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
April 30, 2009 158 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 157 For Scheduling Class Certification Issues: Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/30/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
January 21, 2009 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 149 Re: Joint Discovery Plan and Mediation Proposal. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/21/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
September 30, 2008 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting in part and denying in part 103 Motion to Dismiss. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert H, Hansen v Conseco Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?