Coalition for ICANN Transparency, Inc. v. Verisign, Inc. et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv04826
Filed: November 28, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2011 333 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 332 on Stipulation for Dismissal of Action, and for Retention of Jurisdiction Over Action to Enforce Settlement, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/31/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
April 20, 2011 330 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 273 defendant's Motion for Discovery; denying 328 defendant's Motion Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing. 4/26/2011 motion hearing is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
March 28, 2011 321 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 319 Continuing Mediation Deadline From March 31, 2011 to May 13, 2011. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/28/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 4, 2011 312 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 305 Shortensing Time for Hearing on Motion of Coalition for ICANN Transparency Inc. to Deny Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment or to Continue the Hearing Date Pursuant to Rule 56(F). Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2011 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/4/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
February 11, 2011 283 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 255 Motion for Leave to File; granting 257 Motion to Dismiss (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 9, 2011 281 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 262 to Continue Mediation Deadline From 1/20/2011 to 3/31/2011. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/9/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
January 31, 2011 266 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 234 defendant's Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Second Set). 2/1/2011 motion hearing is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
December 20, 2010 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 252 Parties' Joint Request for an Order Shortening Time. Motion hearings re 232 , 233 , 234 set for 2/1/2011, 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/20/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 16, 2010 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 230 Motion for Leave to File; denying 240 Motion to Amend/Correct (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 15, 2010 247 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal from Discovery Reference. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/14/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
November 30, 2005 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte setting hearing on application for preliminary injunction (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2005)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coalition for ICANN Transparency, Inc. v. Verisign, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?