Smith v. Kirkland

Case Number: 5:2005cv05168
Filed: December 13, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 26 39 Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
June 11, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on June 11, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
July 2, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 19 Ex Parte Application.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
May 7, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
February 11, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to show cause. Signed by Judge Whyte on 2/9/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
November 13, 2008 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring petitioner to amend 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Antoine Smith in response to 12 letter. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/10/2008. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?