Zoltar Satellite Systems Inc., v. LG Electronics Mobile Communications Company et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv00044
Filed: January 6, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2009 260 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Closing Case re 259 Case Management Statement. The Court orders the Case Management Conference currently scheduled for 2/9/2009 is VACATED and that this case be closed by the Clerk of Court. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/3/2009. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
January 9, 2009 257 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 1/30/2009. The Statement shall include, among other things, a chart containing the patents and claims asserted against Wherify and the terms to be construed. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/9/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/9/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
December 22, 2008 256 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE between Zoltar and SPRINT ONLY re 255 Stipulation filed. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/22/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008) Modified on 12/24/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2008 240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Case Mangement Conference set for 2/11/2008 re 239 Case Management Statement (Joint), Case Management Statement (Joint) filed by Zoltar Satellite systems, Inc., Sprint Corporation, Motorola Inc. The Court will set a further case management conference when it issues its Second Claim Construction Order. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/7/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zoltar Satellite Systems Inc., v. LG Electronics Mobile Communications Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?