Morales v. Tilton

Case Number: 5:2006cv00219
Filed: January 13, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2013 581 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING KEVIN COOPER'S MOTION TO INTERVENE AND TO STAY EXECUTION. (564 in 3:06-cv-00219-RS) Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/19/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
November 21, 2012 563 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESOLVING MOTIONS TO INTERVENE AND TO STAY EXECUTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/21/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
August 10, 2012 554 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/10/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
May 17, 2012 536 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING BRIEFING ON COX'S MOTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/16/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
April 5, 2012 534 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO VACATE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/5/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
November 3, 2011 531 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SCHEDULE FOR COMPLETING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/3/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
May 16, 2011 524 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULE FOR COMPLETING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/13/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
April 29, 2011 519 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PUBLIC RELEASE OF TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE HELD APRIL 29, 2011. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/29/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 6, 2011 518 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 4/29/2011 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/6/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
March 11, 2011 513 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISCOVERY AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/11/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
February 11, 2011 493 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REDIRECTING PUBLIC RELEASE OF TRANSCRIPT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/10/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 4, 2011 487 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2011 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/4/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 1, 2011 480 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING MEDIA REQUESTS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/1/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
January 28, 2011 475 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING MEDIA ACCESS TO EVIDENTIARY HEARING AT SAN QUENTIN STATE PRISON. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/26/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 19, 2011 473 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/19/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 4, 2011 471 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING PORTION OF EVIDENTIARY HEARING AT SAN QUENTIN STATE PRISON. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/4/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
January 3, 2011 469 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING ELECTRONIC FILING OF DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/30/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
December 10, 2010 461 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 430 PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/10/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
November 17, 2010 453 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY AND DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS' FOURTH MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/17/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 12, 2010 448 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 447 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/12/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 10, 2010 445 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/10/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
November 8, 2010 439 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SHORTENING TIME. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2010 at 4:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/4/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
October 26, 2010 433 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING BRIEFING OF DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/26/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 5, 2010 425 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/5/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
September 28, 2010 424 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING REMAND. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/28/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 25, 2010 406 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel denying (405) Plaintiff Brown's Second Request for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration in case 5:06-cv-00219-JF (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2010)
September 24, 2010 401 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; AND DENYING CONDITIONALLY INTERVENOR'S MOTION FOR A STAY OF EXECUTION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/24/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 16, 2010 388 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 386 MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR MOTION TO INTERVENE AND FOR MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/16/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 2, 2010 385 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 9/21/2010 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/2/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 6, 2010 381 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING REGULATORY ACTION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/4/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales v. Tilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?