United States of America et al v. Lighthouse Capital Corp

Case Number: 5:2006cv00401
Filed: January 20, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2007 FILE located at Federal Records Center (FRC), San Bruno, CA, Accession No: 021-07-0061, Location No: 735508, Box No: 158. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2007)
September 5, 2006 16 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL re 14 Proposed Order filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/5/06. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2006)
September 1, 2006 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 9/1/2006)
September 1, 2006 14 Proposed Order Application and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal by United States of America. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 9/1/2006)
August 16, 2006 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 8/16/2006)
August 16, 2006 12 Declaration of Joe Smith Proof of Service and filed byUnited States of America. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 8/16/2006)
August 4, 2006 11 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/11/2006 09:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 9/5/2006. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/4/06. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2006)
June 27, 2006 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 6/27/2006)
June 27, 2006 9 Proposed Order Application for Entry of Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joe Smith)(Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 6/27/2006)
June 27, 2006 8 Proposed Order Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt by United States of America. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 6/27/2006)
April 19, 2006 7 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware vacating hearing on OSC; Ordering Defendant to comply with summons. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2006)
February 27, 2006 6 Minute Entry: Show Cause Hearing (Date Filed: 2/27/2006). (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (mp, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/27/2006)
February 22, 2006 5 Declaration of Michael Shapiro Proof of Service and Declaration of Michael Shapiro filed byUnited States of America. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 2/22/2006)
February 3, 2006 4 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: enforcement of IRS summons. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/27/2006 09:00 AM.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/3/06. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/17/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2006 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2006)
January 20, 2006 3 Featured Case STANDING ORDER regarding case management in civil cases. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/20/06. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/26/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2006 2 Proposed Order to show cause re: enforcement of re 1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons by United States of America, Joe Smith. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/26/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2006 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons (no process). Filed byUnited States of America, Joe Smith. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/26/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Lighthouse Capital Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?