Razavi v. Haefer et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv00473
Filed: January 24, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on March 25, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
February 26, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Dismissal. Show Cause Response due by 3/6/2009. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/16/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/26/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 10, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Finding Cases Not Related. Signed by Judge James Ware on February 10, 2009. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Razavi v. Haefer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?