Bursese v. Paypal., Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Scott Bursese
Defendant: Paypal., Inc.
Case Number: 5:2006cv00636
Filed: January 31, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2009 FILE located at Federal Records Center (FRC), San Bruno, CA: Accession No: 021-08-0051; Location No: 211827; Box No: 101. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
November 16, 2007 86 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Scott Bursese. (Leigh, Gilbert) (Filed on 11/16/2007)
August 30, 2007 85 CLERK'S NOTICE Rescheduling Case Management Conference set for 9/7/2007 10:30 AM before Honorable Ronald M. Whyte. (cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2007)
August 16, 2007 84 Featured Case ORDER Assessing Jury Fees. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/16/07. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/16/2007 (jg, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2007 83 Minute Entry: Settlement Put on the Record Before Visiting Judge Randall Rader. (Date Filed: 8/13/2007). Settlement Should be Finalized Within 2 Weeks. Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2007 10:30 AM Before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/13/2007)
April 19, 2007 81 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Re: 80 to Continue the Trial Date: Jury Trial set for 6/11/2007 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/19/07. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2007)
April 11, 2007 80 STIPULATION for Continuance of Trial Date and Modification of Case Management Order by Scott Bursese. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 4/11/2007)
April 11, 2007 79 Declaration of JUAN ENRIQUE PEARCE in Support of Stipulation for Continuance of Trial Date and Modification of Case Management Order filed byScott Bursese. (Pearce, Juan) (Filed on 4/11/2007)
March 15, 2007 78 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition to 74 Defendant's Motion in Limine #3 filed by Scott Bursese. (Pearce, Juan) (Filed on 3/15/2007) Modified on 3/27/2007 to link entry to document #74 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2007 77 Memorandum in Opposition to 74 Def's Motion in Limine #3 filed byScott Bursese. (Pearce, Juan) (Filed on 3/15/2007) Modified on 3/27/2007 to link entry to document #74 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2007 76 OBJECTIONS to Defendant PayPal, Inc.'s Revised Objections to the Admissibility of Plaintiff's Proposed Trial Exhibits by Paypal., Inc.. (Brown, Christian) (Filed on 3/14/2007)
March 13, 2007 75 Declaration of Christian Brown in Support of 74 MOTION in Limine Defendant PayPal, Inc.'s Motion in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Evidence and Recovery of Damages Beyond Those Referenced in Plaintiff's Rule 26 Disclosures filed byPaypal., Inc.. (Related document(s) 74 ) (Brown, Christian) (Filed on 3/13/2007)
March 13, 2007 74 MOTION in Limine Defendant PayPal, Inc.'s Motion in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Evidence and Recovery of Damages Beyond Those Referenced in Plaintiff's Rule 26 Disclosures filed by Paypal., Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2007 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Yuhas, George) (Filed on 3/13/2007)
March 8, 2007 73 Minute Entry: Pretrial Conference held. (Date Filed: 3/8/2007). (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/8/2007)
March 7, 2007 72 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiff's Proposed Form of Verdict by Paypal., Inc.. (Brown, Christian) (Filed on 3/7/2007)
March 6, 2007 71 OBJECTIONS to re 70 Objection CORRECTION OF DOCKET #70 OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED EXHIBITS by Scott Bursese. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 3/6/2007)
March 6, 2007 70 **DOCKETED IN ERROR, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT #71** OBJECTIONS to Defendant's Proposed Jury Instructions by Scott Bursese. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 3/6/2007) Modified text on 3/21/2007 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2007 69 Memorandum in Opposition to 58 Defendant's Motion In Limine #2 filed by Scott Bursese. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 3/6/2007) Modified on 3/21/2007 to link entry to document #58(dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2007 68 Memorandum in Opposition to 57 Defendant's Motion In Limine #1 filed by Scott Bursese. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 3/6/2007) Modified on 3/21/2007 to link entry to document #57 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2007 67 OBJECTIONS to Defendant PayPal, Inc.'s Objections to the Admissibility of Plaintiff's Proposed Trial Exhibits by Paypal., Inc.. (Brown, Christian) (Filed on 3/6/2007)
March 6, 2007 66 OBJECTIONS to Defendant PayPal, Inc.'s Objections and Counter-Designations to Plaintiff's Affirmatively Designated Deposition Testimony by Paypal., Inc.. (Brown, Christian) (Filed on 3/6/2007)
March 6, 2007 65 Memorandum in Opposition re 62 MOTION in Limine No. 2 (to Exclude Evidence of Paul Montgomery's Alleged Anxiety Disorder) Defendant PayPal, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2 re Paul Montgomery's Anxiety Disorder filed byPaypal., Inc.. (Brown, Christian) (Filed on 3/6/2007)
March 6, 2007 64 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 61 MOTION in Limine No. 1 (To Exclude Evidence of the Terms of the Separation Agreement) Defendant PayPal, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 re the Terms of the Separation Agreement filed byPaypal., Inc.. (Brown, Christian) (Filed on 3/6/2007)
March 5, 2007 Received copies of deposition transcripts that plaintiff intends to offer as evidence by Scott Bursese. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2007)
March 5, 2007 Proposed Form of Verdict by Paypal., Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2007)
March 5, 2007 Proposed Form of Verdict by Scott Bursese. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2007)
March 5, 2007 63 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held; case not settled. (Date Filed: 3/5/2007). () (cm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/5/2007)
March 3, 2007 62 MOTION in Limine No. 2 (to Exclude Evidence of Paul Montgomery's Alleged Anxiety Disorder) filed by Scott Bursese. Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2007 01:30 PM. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 3/3/2007)
March 3, 2007 61 MOTION in Limine No. 1 (To Exclude Evidence of the Terms of the Separation Agreement) filed by Scott Bursese. Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2007 01:30 PM. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 3/3/2007)
March 2, 2007 60 Pretrial Conference Statement by Scott Bursese [JOINT]. (Pearce, Juan) (Filed on 3/2/2007)
March 2, 2007 59 Proposed Voir Dire by Paypal., Inc.. (Brown, Christian) (Filed on 3/2/2007)
March 2, 2007 58 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Preclude Reference To Complaints Made About Alleged Unauthorized Software Use) filed by Paypal., Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Brown, Christian) (Filed on 3/2/2007)
March 2, 2007 57 MOTION in Limine No. 1 (To Preclude Reference To Paul Montgomery's Photography) filed by Paypal., Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Brown, Christian) (Filed on 3/2/2007)
February 28, 2007 56 CLERK'S NOTICE scheduling Settlement Conference set for 3/5/2007 02:00 PM before Magistrate Patricia V. Trumbull. (cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2007)
February 12, 2007 55 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Whyte on 28 36 Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2007)
February 2, 2007 82 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/2/2007 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 2/2/2007) re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Paypal., Inc.,, 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment , or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication filed by Scott Bursese,. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/2/2007)
January 31, 2007 54 (Corrected) Declaration of G. Whitney Leigh in Support of 50 Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Scott Bursese. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 1/31/2007) Modified on 2/1/2007 to link entry to document #50 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2007 53 (Corrected) Declaration of Scott Bursese in Support of 50 Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed byScott Bursese. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 1/31/2007) Modified on 2/1/2007 to link entry to document #50 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2007 52 Declaration of Enrique Pearce In Support of 50 Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Scott Bursese. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 1/19/2007) Modified text on 1/29/2007 to conform with document posted (dhm, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2007 51 Declaration of Scott Bursese in Opposition to 28 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Scott Bursese. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 1/19/2007) Modified text on 1/29/2007 to conform with document posted (dhm, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2007 50 Reply Memorandum In Support of 36 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication filed by Scott Bursese. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 1/19/2007) Modified text on 1/29/2007 to link entry to document #36 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2007 49 Declaration of G. Whitney Leigh in Opposition to 28 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Scott Bursese. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 1/19/2007) Modified text on 1/29/2007 to conform with document posted (dhm, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2007 48 Reply Memorandum in Support of 28 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Paypal., Inc.. (Yuhas, George) (Filed on 1/19/2007) Modified on 1/29/2007 to link entry to document #28 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2007 47 DECLARATION of Scott Bursese in Opposition to 28 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Scott Bursese. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 1/16/2007) Modified on 1/23/2007 to link entry to document #28 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2007 46 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 28 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Scott Bursese. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 1/12/2007) Modified on 1/23/2007 to link entry to document #28 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2007 45 **DOCKETED IN ERROR, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT #46**DECLARATION of Scott Bursese In Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byScott Bursese. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 1/12/2007) Modified text on 1/16/2007 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2007 44 DECLARATION of G. Whitney Leigh In Support of 46 Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Scott Bursese. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 1/12/2007) Modified on 1/23/2007 to link entry to document #46 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2007 43 DECLARATION of Paul Montgomery in Opposition to 36 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Paypal., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-B to Montgomery Declaration)(Related document(s) 36 ) (Yuhas, George) (Filed on 1/12/2007) Modified text on 1/23/2007 and linked entry to document #36 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2007 42 DECLARATION of George A. Yuhas in Opposition to 36 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Paypal., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C to Yuhas Declaration# 2 Exhibit Exhibits D-E to Yuhas Declaration)(Related document(s) 36 ) (Yuhas, George) (Filed on 1/12/2007) Modified text on 1/23/2007 and linked entry to document #36 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2007 41 MEMORANDUM of Defendant Paypal, Inc. in Opposition to 36 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Paypal Inc.. (Yuhas, George) (Filed on 1/12/2007) Modified on 1/23/2007 to link entry to document # 36 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
January 2, 2007 40 ERRATA to 36 Plaintiff's Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication by Scott Bursese. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 1/2/2007) Modified on 1/11/2007 to link entry to document #36 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2006 39 Proposed Order Granting 36 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication by Scott Bursese. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 12/30/2006) Modified on 1/11/2007 to link entry to document #36 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2006 38 Declaration of G. Whitney Leigh in Support of 36 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication filed by Scott Bursese. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 12/30/2006) Modified on 1/11/2007 to link entry to document #36 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2006 37 Declaration of Scott Bursese in Support of 36 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication filed by Scott Bursese. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 12/30/2006) Modified on 1/11/2007 to link entry to document #36 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2006 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment , or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication filed by Scott Bursese. Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2006 09:00 AM. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 12/29/2006)
December 28, 2006 35 Proposed Order re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Paypal., Inc.. (Yuhas, George) (Filed on 12/28/2006)
December 28, 2006 34 Declaration of Dmitry Doroshenko in Support of 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byPaypal., Inc.. (Related document(s) 28 ) (Yuhas, George) (Filed on 12/28/2006)
December 28, 2006 33 EXHIBITS re 29 Declaration in Support Exhibits E-H filed byPaypal., Inc.. (Related document(s) 29 ) (Yuhas, George) (Filed on 12/28/2006)
December 28, 2006 32 EXHIBITS re 29 Declaration in Support Exhibit D filed byPaypal., Inc.. (Related document(s) 29 ) (Yuhas, George) (Filed on 12/28/2006)
December 28, 2006 31 EXHIBITS re 29 Declaration in Support Exhibit C filed byPaypal., Inc.. (Related document(s) 29 ) (Yuhas, George) (Filed on 12/28/2006)
December 28, 2006 30 EXHIBITS re 29 Declaration in Support Exhibit B filed byPaypal., Inc.. (Related document(s) 29 ) (Yuhas, George) (Filed on 12/28/2006)
December 28, 2006 29 Declaration of George A. Yuhas in Support of 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byPaypal., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 28 ) (Yuhas, George) (Filed on 12/28/2006)
December 28, 2006 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Paypal., Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Yuhas, George) (Filed on 12/28/2006)
November 6, 2006 27 CERTIFICATION OF ENE Session on 11/2/2006, case not settled, no follow up contemplated, ENE complete. Filed by Evaluator, David T. Kelley, dated 11/2/2006. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2006)
October 25, 2006 Set/Reset Hearings: ENE Hearing set for 11/2/2006 09:30 AM., in the offices of the Evaluator, 350 The Embarcadero, Suite 500, San Francisco, CA 94105. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2006)
October 17, 2006 ADR Remark: ENE deadline has been extended to 11/10/2006, see # 26 . (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2006)
October 13, 2006 26 Featured Case ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR ATTENDANCE OF EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION SESSION. Signed by Judge Whyte on 10/13/06. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2006)
October 11, 2006 25 Letter from Chris Brown to Deputy Clerk Jackie Garcia, Clerk to the Hon. Ronald M. Whyte, regarding ENE. (Brown, Christian) (Filed on 10/11/2006)
September 25, 2006 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paypal., Inc. re 23 Declaration in Support, 21 Stipulation, 22 Proposed Order (Brown, Christian) (Filed on 9/25/2006)
September 22, 2006 23 Declaration of CHRISTIAN BROWN IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATIN SESSION filed byPaypal., Inc.. (Brown, Christian) (Filed on 9/22/2006)
September 22, 2006 22 Proposed Order EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR ATTENDANCE OF EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION SESSION by Paypal., Inc.. (Brown, Christian) (Filed on 9/22/2006)
September 22, 2006 21 STIPULATION REQUEST PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 6-2 AND 7-12 FOR AN ORDER E XTENDING THE DEADLINE TO ATTEND EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION by Paypal., Inc.. (Brown, Christian) (Filed on 9/22/2006)
September 11, 2006 Set/Reset Hearings: ENE Hearing set for 10/4/2006 09:30 AM., the Evaluator's office. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2006)
September 11, 2006 20 Letter to parties dated 9/8/2006 from Evaluator, David T. Kelley. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2006)
August 7, 2006 19 Letter dated 8/7/2006 to counsel from Evaluator, David T. Kelley. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2006)
July 26, 2006 18 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ADDENDUM TO PROTECTIVE ORDER (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/26/06. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2006)
July 24, 2006 Judge Howard R. Lloyd added. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2006)
July 21, 2006 17 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing David T. Kelley as ENE Evaluator dated 7/21/2006. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2006)
July 14, 2006 16 Proposed Order STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Paypal., Inc.. (Brown, Christian) (Filed on 7/14/2006)
July 13, 2006 15 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery cutoff by 1/15/2007. Jury Trial set for 3/19/2007 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/13/06. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2006)
July 10, 2006 14 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Amended) Federal Rule 26(f) Report and Proposed Order filed by Scott Bursese. (Pearce, Juan) (Filed on 7/10/2006)
July 10, 2006 12 Proposed Order re Case Management Conference by Scott Bursese. (Pearce, Juan) (Filed on 7/10/2006)
July 7, 2006 13 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/7/2006 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 7/7/2006). Jury Trial set for 3/19/2007 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Referred to ENE. Discovery cutoff 1/15/07.(Court Reporter Not Reported.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/7/2006)
June 28, 2006 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference conducted on 6/28/06 by DB. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2006)
June 28, 2006 11 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options ADR CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Yuhas, George) (Filed on 6/28/2006)
June 26, 2006 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2006 10:30 AM. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2006)
June 23, 2006 9 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FEDERAL RULE 26(f) REPORT AND PROPOSED ORDER filed by Paypal., Inc.. (Yuhas, George) (Filed on 6/23/2006)
June 21, 2006 8 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 6/21/2006)
June 20, 2006 7 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 6/28/06 at 3:00 p.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2006)
June 19, 2006 6 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 6/19/2006)
June 16, 2006 5 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
March 13, 2006 4 ANSWER to Complaint byPaypal., Inc.. (Yuhas, George) (Filed on 3/13/2006)
February 21, 2006 3 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME OF DEFENDANT PAYPAL TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Paypal., Inc.. (Yuhas, George) (Filed on 2/21/2006)
January 31, 2006 Summons Issued as to Paypal., Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2006)
January 30, 2006 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2006)
January 30, 2006 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/23/2006. Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2006 10:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2006)
January 30, 2006 1 COMPLAINT (Summons Issued);jury demand; against Paypal., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 3380973.). Filed byScott Bursese. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/3/2006 (dhm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bursese v. Paypal., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Bursese
Represented By: Juan Enrique Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paypal., Inc.
Represented By: George Alan Yuhas, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?