Palladini v. City of Milpitas et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv00779
Filed: February 3, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2009 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 125 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/22/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
February 25, 2009 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING TRIAL; SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Joint Status Statement or Stipulated Dismissal due 4/17/2009. Status Conference set for 4/27/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motions terminated: 100 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to E xclude Testimony of Anthony Drago, 97 MOTION in Limine No. 1 re Admissibility of Prior and/or Subsequent Citizen Complaints, 102 MOTION in Limine No. 6 Regarding Admissibility of Media Evidence, 103 MOTION in Limine No. 7 R egarding Exclusion of Claims and Damages Not Plead in Complaint, 79 MOTION to Withdraw 75 MOTION to Withdraw 75 Motion for relief, 99 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Testimony of Robert Sylvia, 84 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 101 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Testimony of Angelo Izzo, 98 MOTION in Limine No. 2 Exclude Evidence or Argument Not Previously Disclosed.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/25/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 6, 2009 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Ware granting in part and denying in part 85 Motion for Summary Judgment (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
October 14, 2008 83 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for extension of time for Discovery re 81 Stipulation filed by Frank Palladini. Close of Discovery set for 12/1/2008. This extension does not modify any other deadlines or hearings set by the Court. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/14/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palladini v. City of Milpitas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?