Day v. SBC Disability Income Plan

Case Number: 5:2006cv01740
Filed: March 7, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1002 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2010 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 210 Scheduling Further Briefing re Plaintiff's Second Motion for Attorneys Fees. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/16/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 15, 2010 210 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING MATTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAUL GREWAL FOR DISPOSITION re 209 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 189 Second Interium MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by David Day. In light of Judge Trumbull's recent retirement, the Court re-refers this matter to Magistrate Judge Grewal for an updated Report and Recommendation after he has set deadlines for supplemental briefing and revises the current Report and Recommendation in accordance with the briefing. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/15/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
November 29, 2010 209 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 189 Plaintiff's Second Motion for Attorney Fees. Objections to R&R due by 12/13/2010. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/29/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
February 11, 2010 132 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT for Continuance of Filing Date for Opening Briefs for Cross Motions for Summary Judgment re 130 Stipulation. Opening brief due 2/16/2010. All briefing to be completed by 3/19/2010. Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/11/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
December 3, 2009 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 123 Joint Case Management Statement, 125 Case Management Statement, 124 Case Management Statement. The Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2009 is VACATED. On or before 12/7/2 009, Defendant shall file and serve all counsel a complete copy of the administrative record from the last filing to present. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. The parties shall notice their motions in accordance with the Civil Local Rules of the Court. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/2/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
October 15, 2009 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING 10/19/2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 118 Case Management Statement, 119 Case Management Statement. On or before 11/20/2009, Defendants Plan Administrator shall make a determination on the issue of whether Plaintiffs long-ter m disability benefits shouldbe offset by Plaintiffs pension benefits, and whether Plaintiffs benefits are subject to such an offset pursuant to the terms of the Plan. Joint Case Management Conference Statement due 11/30/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/15/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
June 17, 2009 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 116 Stipulation. The Court VACATES the 6/22/2009 Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Joint statement due 10/9/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
April 22, 2009 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference re 114 Case Management Statement. The Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2009 at 10:00 AM is continued to 6/22/2009 at 10:00 AM. The parties are to file a joint case management conference statement by 6/12/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/22/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
December 9, 2008 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; REMANDING THE CASE TO THE PLAN ADMINISTRATOR FOR LIMITED DETERMINATION. In light of the discussion at the Case Management Conference, the Court orders as follows: Offset of Long-Term Disability Benefits< b>: The Plan Administrator shall make a determination on this issue within ninety (90) days of the issuance of this Order. Please see Order for further specifics. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 4/17/2009. The Statement shall update th e Court on the status of the remand and any subsequently resolution by the parties of the issues addressed in this Order. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/9/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
October 2, 2008 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE from 10/6/2008 to 12/1/2008 re 105 Case Management Statement, 106 Case Management Statement. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 11/21/2008. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/2/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Day v. SBC Disability Income Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?