Kinderstart.Com, LLC v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff KinderStart.com LLC alleges that defendant Google, Inc. blocked plaintiff\'s website from the Google search engine and caused a drop in plaintiff\'s traffic and AdSense revenues.

Plaintiff: Kinderstart.Com, LLC
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Appellant: Gregory John Yu
Case Number: 5:2006cv02057
Filed: March 17, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2007 114
CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2007)
August 2, 2007 111 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER of USCA as to [99] Notice of Appeal filed by Gregory John Yu. The parties have stipulated to the dismissal of No. 07-15709. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2007 (gm, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2007 113 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER of USCA as to [98] Notice of Appeal, filed by Kinderstart.Com, LLC. The parties have stipulated to the dismissal of these appeal. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2007 (gm, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2007 108
Certificate of Record Mailed to USCA re appeal [98] Notice of Appeal, : (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2007)
April 18, 2007 101
JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on April 18, 2007. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
April 16, 2007 97
ASSOCIATION of Counsel Hennefer Finley & Wood, LLP, et al. by Kinderstart.Com, LLC. (Yu, Gregory) (Filed on 4/16/2007)
April 3, 2007 95
Plaintiffs' NOTICE to the Court that its response to Goggle's Submission will be made to the court no later than Apeil 13, 2007 by Kinderstart.Com, LLC re 92 (Yu, Gregory) (Filed on 4/3/2007) Modified on 4/3/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2007 92 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion for Sanctions, denying 69 Motion for Sanctions (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2007)
February 6, 2007 86 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel RE 85 stipulation for extension (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2007)
January 22, 2007 83 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RE 60 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on January 22, 2007. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2007)
January 19, 2007 84
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/19/2007 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 1/19/2007) re 60 MOTION for Sanctions. The motion is taken under submission, after in camera review. (Court Reporter Gina Galvan.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/19/2007)
January 8, 2007 82 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER re 74 GRANTING MOTION to Relate Case Number CV-06-7297-JF.. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/5/07. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2007)
January 3, 2007 81
Reply to Opposition re 69 Cross MOTION for Sanctions Against Google, Inc. and David H. Kramer filed byKinderstart.Com, LLC. (Yu, Gregory) (Filed on 1/3/2007)
December 8, 2006 79
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kinderstart.Com, LLC re 78 Memorandum in Opposition, Chambers Copies (Yu, Gregory) (Filed on 12/8/2006)
December 1, 2006 77
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Defendant Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion Re: 74 Related Cases, 75 Declaration of David H. Kramer in Support of Defendant's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related and Proposed Order Granting Defendant Google Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Relate Case served on Carl E. Person on December 1, 2006, filed by Google, Inc.. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 12/1/2006) Modified on 12/7/2006 (gm, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2006 73
CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Google's Rule 11 Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2006)
October 27, 2006 67
Minute Entry: Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike hearing held on 10/27/2006 before Judge Jeremy Fogel. The motions are taken under submission. The case management conference is not held. (Date Filed: 10/27/2006). (Court Reporter Peter Torreano.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/27/2006)
October 23, 2006 65
CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference Time, Motions and Case Management Conference are set for 10/27/2006 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2006)
October 20, 2006 64
Reply to Opposition re 49 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Google's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 10/20/2006)
October 13, 2006 56
Memorandum in Opposition 12(b) Motion filed byKinderstart.Com, LLC. (Yu, Gregory) (Filed on 10/13/2006)
September 26, 2006 55 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITS re 48 Stipulation filed by Google, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/26/06. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2006)
September 18, 2006 48
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Exceed Page Limits for Briefing in Connection with Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Google, Inc.. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 9/18/2006)
September 1, 2006 47
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Class Action Complaint against Google, Inc.. Filed byKinderstart.Com, LLC. (Yu, Gregory) (Filed on 9/1/2006)
August 11, 2006 46
ADMINISTRATIVE AND CLARIFICATION ORDER, granting in part 43 request for an extension of time. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2006)
July 13, 2006 42 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL (1) GRANTING 11 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; AND (2) DEFERRING CONSIDERATION OF 12 DEFENDANT'S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2006)
July 12, 2006 41
Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel Requesting Correction to 06/30/2006 hearing transcript. (Yu, Gregory) (Filed on 7/12/2006)
June 30, 2006 39
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/30/2006 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 6/30/2006). (Court Reporter Peter Torreano.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/30/2006)
June 28, 2006 38
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options Plaintiff KinderStart.com LLC (Yu, Gregory) (Filed on 6/28/2006)
June 26, 2006 35 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER DENYING 31 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST UNDER LOCAL RULE 7-7 TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/26/06. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2006)
June 16, 2006 33
Reply Memorandum re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Google Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
June 8, 2006 25 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE OR VACATE HEARING DATE AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS re 19 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Injunction Motion filed 5/26/06 filed by Kinderstart.Com, LLC,, 17 MOTION Defendant Google Inc.'s MIscellaneous Administrative Request Under L.R. 7-11 to Continue or Vacate Preliminary Injunction Hearing Date filed by Google, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/8/06. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/8/2006 (jfsec, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2006 24
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Google, Inc.. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 6/6/2006)
June 1, 2006 22
Proposed Order re 19 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Injunction Motion filed 5/26/06 by Kinderstart.Com, LLC. (Yu, Gregory) (Filed on 6/1/2006)
May 31, 2006 18
Declaration of David H. Kramer in Support of 17 MOTION Defendant Google Inc.'s MIscellaneous Administrative Request Under L.R. 7-11 to Continue or Vacate Preliminary Injunction Hearing Date filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Related document(s)17) (Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 5/31/2006)
May 18, 2006 15
CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2006 at 10:30 AM. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2006)
May 12, 2006 14
NOTICE by Google, Inc. Defendant Google Inc.'s Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Kramer, David) (Filed on 5/12/2006)
April 26, 2006 9
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2006)
April 25, 2006 8
Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Kinderstart.Com, LLC Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Yu, Gregory) (Filed on 4/25/2006)
April 13, 2006 7
*** FILED IN ERROR. DUPLICATE OF DOCKET #4. ***
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kinderstart.Com, LLC, Google, Inc.. Google, Inc. served on 4/12/2006, answer due 5/2/2006. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/14/2006 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2006 3
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended against all defendants. Filed byKinderstart.Com, LLC. (Yu, Gregory) (Filed on 4/12/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinderstart.Com, LLC v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Bart Edward Volkmer, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinderstart.Com, LLC
Represented By: Joseph H. C. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gregory John Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?