Rezner v. Bayerische Hypo-Und Vereinsbank AG et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv02064
Filed: March 17, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2015 645 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 618 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
May 6, 2015 643 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/6/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2015)
April 22, 2015 626 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria: denying 588 Motion in Limine; denying 596 Motion in Limine; granting 598 Motion in Limine; granting 599 Motion in Limine; granting 600 Motion in Limine; granting 610 Motion in Limine; deny ing 612 Motion in Limine; denying 614 Motion in Limine. Plaintiff's Motion in Limine three and defendants' Motion in Limines one and five are taken under submission. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2015) Modified on 4/22/2015 (knm, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2015 625 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 622 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Ivan.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
April 6, 2015 586 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria terminating 571 Motion to Dismiss; terminating 571 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 575 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 575 Motion for Summary Judgment (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
February 23, 2015 578 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 570 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2015)
February 19, 2015 577 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 574 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
February 11, 2015 572 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 567 Motion for Leave to Amend.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
December 17, 2014 562 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 559 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by John N. Rezner. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/17/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
May 30, 2012 525 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on May 30, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
December 6, 2011 498 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER; VACATING CMC Motions in Limine and Joint Pretrial Conference Statement due by 1/30/2012. Bench Trial set for 3/20/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. James Ware. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2012 11 :00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Bench Trial set for 3/21/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. James Ware. Bench Trial set for 3/22/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. James Ware. Bench Trial set for 3/23/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. James Ware. Bench Trial set for 3/27/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. James Ware. Bench Trial set for 3/28/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/6/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
April 5, 2011 475 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING re 474 Stipulation. Due to the Court's own unavailability, the Court cannot accommodate the parties' proposed date. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/5/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
February 23, 2011 462 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Defendants shall file its Motion to dismiss the action in its entirety on or before 3/4/2011. Plaintiff shall file an Opposition on or before 3/18/2011. Defendants shall file a Reply on or before 3/25/2011. Anticipated Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/23/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
January 4, 2011 456 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN LIGHT OF NINTH CIRCUIT REMAND re 455 USCA Memorandum. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2011. Case Management Conference set for 2/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/4/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
September 11, 2009 442 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 441 Docket Annotation filed by HVB Structured Finance, Inc., 440 Proposed Order, filed by HVB Structured Finance, Inc., Bayerische Hypo-Und Vereinsbank AG. The Court hereby orders the enforcement and execution of the Stipulated Judgment STAYED for the Duration of Defendants' Appeal. Signed by Judge James Ware on September 11, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009) Modified on docket text 9/14/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2009 435 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY ENFORCEMENT OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT re 419 MOTION to Stay Enforcement of the Stipulated Judgment. On or before September 3, 2009, Defendant shall post a bond in the above amount and a proposed Order for Stay in Execution of the Stipulated Judgment for the Courts approval. Signed by Judge James Ware on August 3, 2009. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009) Modified docket text on 8/3/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2009 430 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 429 Stipulation. Reply due 7/24/2009. The Court notes that it was Defendants who requested an expedited schedule for this Motion. Accordingly, the Court grants Defendants a one-week extension to file their Reply or resolve this dispute with Plaintiff. Signed by Judge James Ware on July 17, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009) Modified docket text on 7/21/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2009 410 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE re 409 Statement. Stipulate Dismissal or Joint Status Statement due 6/11/2009. Status Conference set for 6/15/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/29/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 15, 2009 405 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING CONSENT JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SETTLEMENT re 400 Stipulation. The Court VACATES all trial dates. The Court orders the Clerk of Court to terminate all pending motions. Motions terminated: 180 MOTION for Protective Orde r 287 SEALED MOTION, 307 REDACTION to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 10 to Preclude Evidence Regarding Plaintiff's Net Worth, 283 SEALED MOTION, 371 SEALED MOTION, 284 SEALED MOTION, 290 SEALED MOTION, 375 SEAL ED MOTION, 288 SEALED MOTION, 190 MOTION to Seal Exhibits F-J, 282 SEALED MOTION, 325 REDACTION to MOTION To Exclude or Limit Testimony of Jon D. Wheeler. Stipulated Dismissal or Joint Status Report due by 5/22/2009. Status Conference set for 6/1/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/15/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 12, 2009 390 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED Re Damages Briefing re 389 Stipulation. The briefs shall be submitted on 5/13/2009 by 3 p.m. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/12/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
March 6, 2009 164 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Hearing on Motion from 3/23/2009 to 4/6/2009 as to 152 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment; 162 Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date. Please see Order for stipulated briefing schedule. Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/6/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009) Modified docket text/added linkage on 3/9/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2009 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 157 Letter filed by John N. Rezner. Signed by Judge James Ware on February 6, 2009. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
January 29, 2009 151 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS re (149 in 5:06-cv-02064-JW) Stipulation filed by Bayerische Hypo-Und Vereinsbank AG, (18 in 5:08-cv-03479-JW) Stipulation filed by Bayerische Hypo-Und Ver einsbank AG. Pretrial Conference as to 5:08-cv-03479-JW set for 3/9/2009 10:00 AM, and Pretrial Conference as to 5:06-cv-02064-JW set for 3/9/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/28/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
December 10, 2008 147 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT RE MODIFICATION OF CASE SCHEDULE re 146 Pretrial Conference Statement, 145 Stipulation. Close of All Discovery due by 3/31/2009. Last Date to Hear Dispositive Motions on 5/18/2009 @ 9:00 AM. Joint Pretrial Statements due 12/13/2009. Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/10/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
November 20, 2008 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING STIPULATION FOR MODIFICATION OF CASE SCHEDULE re 143 Stipulation. The Court DENIES the parties stipulation without prejudice to being renewed. The parties are to update the Court of their Mediation efforts in their Joint Pretrial Stat ement due 12/5/2008. The Preliminary Pretrial Conference remains set for 12/15/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/20/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rezner v. Bayerische Hypo-Und Vereinsbank AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?