Hoffman v. Evans

Case Number: 5:2006cv02248
Filed: March 30, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2010 120 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER - (JURY TRIAL). The Court VACATES the 1/25/2010 Preliminary Pretrial Conference and ORDERS as follows: Joint Pretrial Conference Statement, In Limine Motions, and Proposed Jury Instructions Due 2/12/20 10. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2010 11:00 AM, Jury Selection set for 3/2/2010 09:00AM, Jury Trial set for 3/3/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Please see Order for further trial specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
December 14, 2009 117 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT'S REBUTTAL EXPERT re 116 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/14/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
October 20, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT OF PRO SE PRISONER EARLY SETTLEMENT PROCEEDING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/20/2009. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 2, 2009 97 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT for a Modified Case Schedule re 96 Proposed Order. Anticipated Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2009 09:00 AM. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statements due 1/15/2010. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/25/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Previously set trial dates are VACATED. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/2/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
July 8, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER - (JURY TRIAL): Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2009 09:00 AM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2009 11:00 AM, Jury Selection set for 1/12/2009 09:00AM, Jury Trial set for 1/13/2009 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/8/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
May 22, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment from 6/15/2009 to 7/6/2009; Continuing Pretrial Conference from 6/28/2009 to 7/6/2009 re 53 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 53 Stipulation, 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment to Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2009 09:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/21/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
January 29, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Pretrial Conference re 39 Stipulation filed by Pierre L. Hoffman. Close of Discovery due by 3/23/2009. Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/27/2009. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/28/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffman v. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?