Kremen v. American Registry For Internet Numbers Ltd. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Gary Kremen
Defendant: American Registry For Internet Numbers Ltd.
Case Number: 5:2006cv02554
Filed: April 12, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2007 54 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Granting Amendement to Order re Clarification of Order Granting Defendant American Registry of Internet Numbers, LTD's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) and/or [Alternative] Stay Order re 53 Amended Document, filed by Gary Kremen. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/17/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2007) Modified text on 10/2/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2007 53
Amendment to 41 Order Re: Clarification of Order Granting Defendant ARIN's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) and/or [Alternative] Stay Order. (Idell, Richard) (Filed on 7/31/2007) Modified on 8/3/2007,(counsel failed to properly link which document relates to) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2007 47
NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel E. Alberti for Defendant's Counsel Stephen M. Ryan (Alberti, Daniel) (Filed on 1/23/2007)
December 20, 2006 42
JUDGMENT signed by Judge James Ware on 12/20/2006. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2006)
November 17, 2006 40
NOTICE of Change of Address by Karl Stephen Kronenberger (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 11/17/2006)
October 23, 2006 39
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/23/2006 before James Ware please see minute order for further details (Date Filed: 10/23/2006). (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/23/2006)
October 16, 2006 38
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Terri R Hanley (Change in Address/Notice of Association) (Hanley, Terri) (Filed on 10/16/2006)
October 11, 2006 33
ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2006)
October 2, 2006 31
Reply Memorandum re 16 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion of American Registry of Internet Numbers, Ltd. to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), or, Alternatively, For a Stay; Memorandum of Points and Authorities -- Reply Memorandum of American Registry for Internet Numbers, Ltd. in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, For Stay filed byAmerican Registry For Internet Numbers Ltd.. (Wanger, Christopher) (Filed on 10/2/2006)
September 29, 2006 30
PROOF OF SERVICE OF 27 AND 28 AND THE notice of filing filed in case number C98-20718 JW docket number #1214 by Gary Kremen (Hanley, Terri) (Filed on 9/29/2006) Modified on 9/29/2006 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified text 10/2/2006, link to documents served. (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2006 26 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING re 25 Stipulation Continuing the Hearing on (1) Defendant American Registry of Internet Numbers, Ltd.'s Notion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to 12(B)(6), or, alternatively, For a Stay; and (2) Case Management Conference, filed by American Registry For Internet Numbers Ltd. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/28/06. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 25, 2006 25
STIPULATION Stipulated Request and [Proposed] Order Continuing the Hearing on (1) Defendant American Registry of Internet Numbers, Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to 12(B)(6), or, Alternatively, for a Stay; and (2) Case Management Conference by American Registry For Internet Numbers Ltd.. (Yeh, Jack) (Filed on 8/25/2006)
August 22, 2006 24 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING re 19 Stipulation Advancing Initial Case Management Conference Two Weeks to September 11, 2006, filed by American Registry For Internet Numbers Ltd. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/22/06. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2006)
August 21, 2006 23
Proposed Order re 20 Memorandum in Opposition to Pl's Motion to Dismiss, Stay by Gary Kremen. (Hanley, Terri) (Filed on 8/21/2006)
August 18, 2006 19
STIPULATION Stipulated Request and [Proposed] Order Advancing Initial Case Management Conference Two Weeks to September 11, 2006 by American Registry For Internet Numbers Ltd.. (Wanger, Christopher) (Filed on 8/18/2006)
July 25, 2006 18
CLERK'S NOTICE rescheduling Case Management Conference set for 9/25/2006 10:00 AM before Honorable James Ware. Case Management Statement due by 9/18/2006. (cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2006)
June 15, 2006 15 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Maxine M. Chesney granting [12] Motion for Pro Hac Vice of attorney Stephen M. Ryan. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2006)
June 14, 2006 14 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 06/12/06. (mp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2006)
June 12, 2006 13 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER OF REFERRAL. Kremen v. American Registry for Internet Numbers, Ltd., C-06-2554 MMC is referred to District Judge James Ware for consideration of whether the case is related to Kremen v. Cohen, et al., C-98-20718 JW PVT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 12, 2006. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) Modified on 6/12/2006 (mmclc1, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2006 (mmclc1, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2006 9 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/3/06. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2006)
May 2, 2006 8
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2006)
April 28, 2006 7
STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time for Responsive Pleading of Defendant American Registry for Internet Numbers, Ltd. by American Registry For Internet Numbers Ltd.. (Wanger, Christopher) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 26, 2006 5
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gary Kremen re 1 Complaint (Proof of Service of Summons) (Hanley, Terri) (Filed on 4/26/2006)
April 12, 2006 3
Certificate of Interested Entities (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/3/2006 (ga, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kremen v. American Registry For Internet Numbers Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Registry For Internet Numbers Ltd.
Represented By: Jack Shi-Jei Yeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Kremen
Represented By: Richard J. Idell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?