Ryan Investment Corporation v. Pedregal De Cabo San Lucas et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv03219
Filed: May 16, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2010 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING HEARING FOR MOTION. In light of the Ninth Circuit's remand, the Court invites Plaintiff to file an appropriate Motion with respect to its claim for quantum meruit. Accordingly, the 12/20/2010 Ca se Management Conference is VACATED. The Court sets 2/14/2011 09:00 AM as the hearing date for Plaintiff's anticipated Motion. The parties shall brief the Motion in accordance with the Civil Local Rules. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/14/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2010)
December 18, 2009 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 125 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/18/2009. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
June 16, 2009 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 103 Motion to Shorten Time (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2009)
March 27, 2009 89 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT. The Court amends its 1/30/09 81 Judgment. Judgment is in favor of Plaintiff Ryan Investment Corp. and against Defendants Pedregal De Cabo San Lucas, Leticia Diaz Rivera, and Manuel Diaz Rivera, Jointly and severally, in the sum of $1,500,000. Defendants shall take nothing by way of their counterclaim. No prejudgment interest is awarded to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge James Ware on March 27, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009) Modified on 4/21/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 30, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan Investment Corporation v. Pedregal De Cabo San Lucas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?