United States of America v. 2002 Toyota 4-Runner, VIN JT3HN86R520373938, California License Number 7D09084 et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv03278
Filed: May 17, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING FROM THE GOVERNMENT. Accordingly, on or before 4/30/2010, the government shall file supplemental briefing clarifying whether Claimants' counsel was served with the Requests for Admissions and, if counsel was not served, whether the Court should excuse the government's failure to serve Claimants' counsel. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/28/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 7, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING 4/12/2010 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE re 47 MOTION to Continue. ***Deadlines terminated, Motions terminated: 47 MOTION to Continue. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/7/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
February 18, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Joint Pretrial Conference statement due 4/2/2010. The Joint Statement shall include the parties proposed trial schedule and an update on any settlement efforts. All other deadlines remain unchanged. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/17/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
December 22, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 34 MOTION TO COMPEL signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 2002 Toyota 4-Runner, VIN JT3HN86R520373938, California License Number 7D09084 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?