Cena et al v. United States Of America

Case Number: 5:2006cv03339
Filed: May 19, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Recovery of IRS Tax
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2008 57 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/21/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
October 23, 2008 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 54 . Further Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2008 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/16/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
September 9, 2008 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 49 REQUEST FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY. Counsel must contact Court Call at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/9/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cena et al v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?