In Re: Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., Derivative Litigation

Case Number: 5:2006cv03344
Filed: May 22, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2009 255 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 254 Stipulation. This action is stayed in its entirety, including discovery, pending resolution of Defendants motions for summary judgment. Defendants' Motions to Strike the purportedly Corrected Third Amended Complai nt, and any related obligation to oppose same, is DENIED without prejudice to be renewed. Please see Order for briefing schedule on Motions for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Motions terminated: 240 MOTION to Strike 235 Corrected Third Amended Verified Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/5/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
January 21, 2009 253 Opinion or Order of the Court FILED IN ERROR. ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 21, 2009. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009) Modified on 1/21/2009 (jwlc1, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2008 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Following Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 1/16/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/30/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
December 18, 2008 237 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE CORRECTED THIRD AMENDED VERIFIED CONSOLIDATED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT re 234 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/18/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
October 2, 2008 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 191 Ex Parte Application ; granting 193 Motion for Joinder; granting 196 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting 204 Motion for Joinder (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
May 25, 2006 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/25/06. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., Derivative Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?